Stubbs v. United States Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Timothy John Stubbs
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States Department of Justice, John Koskinen, Registrar of the State of Indiana, Indiana Secretary of State, Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Revenue, John (I) Koskinen, Director of Foreign Assets Control Department of the Treasury, Jovita Carranza, Postmaster General, Loretta Lynch, Jacob Lew, Secretary-General of the United Nations, Commissioner of Social Security Administration, Governor of the State of Colorado, The, Govenor of the State of Indiana and Bankers Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00092
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. ORDERED that Plaintiff file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of this order that complies with the pleading requirements of Rule 8 as discussed in this order. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall obtain the court-approved Prisoner Complaint form (with the assistance of his case manager or the facility's legal assistant), along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. FURTHER ORDERED that, if Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/26/2020. (apesa, )
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the Prisoners Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #8 ) is granted. That the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #4 ) is denied as moot. That within thirty days of the date of this Order Plaintiff's custodian shall disburse from Plaintiffs prison account an initial partial filing fee of $15.00 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado, which represents 20 percent of the greater of the (1) average monthly deposits, or (2) average monthly balance in Plaintiffs prison account for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. See 28 U.S.C. 1915 (b). that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to FLM/Legal Svcs~@bop.gov., by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/25/2020.(mailed as ordered)(evana, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Timothy John Stubbs. (evana, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED Prisoner COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of State, United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Justice, Jacob Lew, Loretta Lynch, Jovita Carranza, Postmaster General, John Koskinen, John (I) Koskinen, Commissioner of Social Security Administration, Secretary-General of the United Nations, Governor of the State of Colorado, The, Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Revenue, Govenor of the State of Indiana, Director of Foreign Assets Control Department of the Treasury, Bankers Insurance Company, Registrar of the State of Indiana, Indiana Secretary, filed by Timothy John Stubbs.(evana, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Order seeking Information about property, by Plaintiff Timothy John Stubbs. (evana, )
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER In response to the Order Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies (ECF No. #3 ) Plaintiff has submitted a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #4 ). Plaintiff has failed to cure the deficiencies because he has not filed on the proper forms a Prisoner Complaint and a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Plaintiff will be given one more opportunity to cure the deficiencies and must do so on or before March 13, 2020, if he wishes to pursue any claims in this action. Plaintiff is reminded that the action will be dismissed without further notice if he fails to cure all of the deficiencies within the time allowed, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/14/2020. (evana, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Plaintiff Timothy John Stubbs. (rvill, ) Modified to correct file date on 2/4/2020 (rvill, ).
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. That, if Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/13/2020. (evana, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 DECLARATION of Nationality by Plaintiff Timothy John Stubbs. (cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stubbs v. United States Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Koskinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Registrar of the State of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Director of the Colorado Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) Koskinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of Foreign Assets Control Department of the Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jovita Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Postmaster General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary-General of the United Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Govenor of the State of Indiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy John Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?