Liberty Mutual Insurance Company v. Jaffe et al
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Robert Jaffe and Marci D Jaffe
Case Number: 1:2020cv00142
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER. PLEASE NOTE DATE AND TIME CHANGE ONLY. This matter is before the Court sua sponte. In accordance with efforts to minimize the spread of the coronavirus, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for March 31, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to May 21, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Any conflicts with the new setting shall be addressed by filing a motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the proposed scheduling order shall be submitted on or before May 14, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/16/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Marci D Jaffe waiver sent on 1/28/2020, answer due 3/30/2020; Robert Jaffe waiver sent on 1/28/2020, answer due 3/30/2020. (Spano, Brian)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/27/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/24/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 3/31/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#3-2] is March 17, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/27/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED.pursuant to #5 Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00142-KLM. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/27/2020. (jgonz, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for DECLARATORY RELIEF against Marci D Jaffe, Robert Jaffe (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7103983)Attorney Brian John Spano added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Robert Jaffe, #4 Summons to Marci Jaffe)(Spano, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company v. Jaffe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marci D Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?