Judson V. Walgreens CO. et al
Defendant: Glenn Jamie, Kathryn L Judson, Walgreens Co. and Mitchell Bramlage
Case Number: 1:2020cv00159
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331sx
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER The Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2020 10:30 AM is VACATED and RESET for 4/30/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall submit a joint Proposed Scheduling Order on or before 4/23/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/16/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth, Sixth, and Seventh Claims for Relief. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/16/2020. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 3/12/2020. Text Only Entry (cmalc3)
March 12, 2020 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #17 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00159-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Standing Order Regarding Appearances for Certain Civil Non-Evidentiary Proceedings for Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/11/2020. (jgonz, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Kathryn L. Judson All parties do not consent.. (Limpus, Christopher)
March 11, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Farmacias Ahumada S.A., Corporate Parent Farmacias Benavides S.A.B. de C.V., Corporate Parent Nanjing Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd., Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co. for Walgreens CO.. (Muhleisen, Michelle)
March 10, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Mitchell Bramlage, Jamie Glenn, Walgreens CO..(Muhleisen, Michelle)
March 10, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth, Sixth and Seventh Claims of Relief by Defendants Mitchell Bramlage, Jamie Glenn, Walgreens CO.. (Muhleisen, Michelle)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the #1 Complaint is extended to 3/10/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/18/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Mitchell Bramlage, Jamie Glenn, Walgreens CO.. (Muhleisen, Michelle)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/25/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 3/11/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/18/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/22/2020. (jgonz, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jamie Glenn by Plaintiff Kathryn L. Judson. (Limpus, Christopher)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Mitchell Bramlage by Plaintiff Kathryn L. Judson. (Limpus, Christopher)
January 22, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Walgreens Co. by Plaintiff Kathryn L. Judson. (Limpus, Christopher)
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (evana, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #4 Memorandum Returning Case This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00159 STV. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for reassignment by Senior Judge Robert E. Blackburn (evana, )
January 20, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Summons not issued. (alave, )
January 20, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mitchell Bramlage, Glenn Jamie, Walgreens Co. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7105072)Attorney Christopher Lee Limpus added to party Kathryn L Judson(pty:dft), filed by Kathryn L Judson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Limpus, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judson V. Walgreens CO. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Jamie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn L Judson
Represented By: Christopher Lee Limpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Bramlage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?