Steinman v. Integrity Recovery Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Casey Steinman
Defendant: Integrity Recovery Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00164
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2020 11:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 4/6/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/7/2020. Text Only Entry (amont, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Steinman. Integrity Recovery Management, LLC served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Sellers, James)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding.By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/22/20. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rsams, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX093712. (rsams, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (rsams, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Integrity Recovery Management, LLC (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney James Arden Sellers, II added to party Casey Steinman(pty:pla), filed by Casey Steinman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sellers, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinman v. Integrity Recovery Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Steinman
Represented By: James Arden Sellers, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Recovery Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?