Plotner v. Mesa County Detention Facility
Plaintiff: John Wesley Plotner
Defendant: No Named Defendants, Lorie Coleman, Naphcare Corporte Office and Mesa County Detention Facility
Case Number: 1:2020cv00263
Filed: January 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 7 Inmate Trust Account STATEMENT by Plaintiff John Wesley Plotner. (evana, )
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #4 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. That within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff's custodian shall disburse from Plaintiff's prison account, if funds are available in keeping with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b), an initial partial filing fee of $5.43 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado, which represents 20 percent of the greater of the (1) average monthly deposits, or (2) average monthly balance in Plaintiff's prison accounts for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the Complaint. That Plaintiff's custodian shall continue to disburse monthly payments from Plaintiff's inmate account until full payment of the filing fee has been paid to the Court, even after disposition of the case and regardless of whether relief is granted or denied. That the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to the Mesa County Detention Facility Business Office, Attn: Inmate Accounts, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/10/2020. (mailed as ordered)(evana, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mesa County Detention Facility, Lorie Coleman, Naphcare Corporte Office, filed by John Wesley Plotner.(evana, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff John Wesley Plotner. (evana, )
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this Order must be labeled with the civil action number identified on this Order. That the Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Plaintiff, with a copy of this Order, one blank copy each of the current Court-approved form Prisoner Complaint and Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and applicable instructions. That if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/3/2020. (mailed as ordered) (evana, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 LETTER by Plaintiff John Wesley Plotner. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rsams, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plotner v. Mesa County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wesley Plotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Named Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorie Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naphcare Corporte Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mesa County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?