Miranda Herrera v. Ring & Ring, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Miranda Herrera
Defendant: Ring & Ring, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00268
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 29:0206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2020 10:30 AM is VACATED and RESET for 6/16/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall file a joint Proposed Scheduling Order on or before 6/9/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/27/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #12 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference filed by Gonzalo Miranda Herrera. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/27/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Gonzalo Miranda Herrera. (Jenks, Jocelyn)
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (athom, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Ring & Ring, Inc., d/b/a Wright's Amusements by Plaintiff Gonzalo Miranda Herrera. (Jenks, Jocelyn)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Complaint for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Marshal Service Form) (trvo, )
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/17/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/10/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/10/2020. (jgonz, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Defendant's Address by Plaintiff Gonzalo Miranda Herrera (Jenks, Jocelyn)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, the Court coordinates service of process for plaintiffs granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. However, the Court is not responsible for lack of service where a plaintiff does not provide correct information required for service. Pemberton v. Patton, 673 F. App'x 860, 864 (10th Cir. 2016). Instead, "[i]t is the plaintiff's responsibility to provide the United States Marshal with the address of the person to be served." Fields v. Okla. State Penitentiary, 511 F.3d 1109, 1113 (10th Cir. 2007). Here, Plaintiff's complaint fails to provide an address for service of process on Defendant. On or before 2/19/2020, Plaintiff shall provide the Court with an address for service of process upon Defendant. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/07/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 2/6/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Drawing Case. Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. 2) is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/4/2020. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-268-DDD (angar, ) Modified on 2/6/2020 to correct text (angar, ).
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS, filed by Gonzalo Miranda Herrera.(Jenks, Jocelyn) Modified to correct entry on 2/3/2020 (cmadr, ).
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Miranda Herrera v. Ring and Ring, Inc. against Ring & Ring, Inc. Attorney Jocelyn King Jenks added to party Gonzalo Miranda Herrera (pty:pla), filed by Gonzalo Miranda Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jenks, Jocelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miranda Herrera v. Ring & Ring, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ring & Ring, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalo Miranda Herrera
Represented By: Jocelyn King Jenks
Represented By: Patricia L. Medige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?