Nayo v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Grace Yaa Nayo
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Angela K. Goldinger and Chad Wolf
Case Number: 1:2020cv00289
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: Daniel D Domenico
2 Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/27/2020. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 5/26/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. The proposed Scheduling Order is due 5/19/2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL PROCEEDINGS FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE NINA Y. WANG by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/13/2020. IT IS ORDERED THAT: All proceedings scheduled between March 16, 2020 up to and including April 7, 2020, except for criminal proceedings, are hereby VACATED and will be RESET pursuant to further Order of the court. Accordingly, the #10 Motion to Vacate is DENIED AS MOOT.(nywlc2, )
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #10 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference filed by Angela K. Goldinger, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad Wolf, Andrew Lambrecht. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 3/13/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference by Defendants Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Angela K. Goldinger, Andrew Lambrecht, Chad Wolf. (Shatila, Hana)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hana H. Shatila on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Hana H. Shatila added to party Kenneth T. Cuccinelli(pty:dft), Attorney Hana H. Shatila added to party Angela K. Goldinger(pty:dft), Attorney Hana H. Shatila added to party Andrew Lambrecht(pty:dft), Attorney Hana H. Shatila added to party Chad Wolf(pty:dft) (Shatila, Hana)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/18/20 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/31/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grace Yaa Nayo. Kenneth T. Cuccinelli served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020; Angela K. Goldinger served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020; Andrew Lambrecht served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020; Chad Wolf served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Sweeney, Andrea)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 2/5/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00289-DDD. (athom, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX093873. (alave, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth CUCCINELLI, ANGELA Kristi GOLDINGER, ANDREW LAMBRECHT, CHAD F. WOLF (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Andrea Lee Sweeney added to party Grace Yaa NAYO(pty:pla), filed by Grace Yaa NAYO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Summons Lambrecht, #7 Summons Goldinger, #8 Summons Wolf, #9 Summons Cuccinelli, #10 Summons Barr, #11 Summons Dunn)(Sweeney, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nayo v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Represented By: Hana H. Shatila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Hana H. Shatila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela K. Goldinger
Represented By: Hana H. Shatila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Hana H. Shatila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Yaa Nayo
Represented By: David Lawrence Kolko
Represented By: Andrea Lee Sweeney
Represented By: Jennifer Rilen Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?