USA v. 15607 East Girard Place, Aurora, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $14,250.00 in United States Currency, $5,086.00 in United States Currency, $1,857.00 in United States Currency, $33,000.00 in United States Currency, $1,418.00 in United States Currency, $18,590.00 in United States Currency, 1792 South Nome Way, Aurora, Colorado, $7,440.00 in United States Currency, 15607 East Girard Place, Aurora, Colorado, $6,567.00 in United States Currency, $14,130.00 in United States Currency, $12,999.00 in United States Currency, 4 Western Union Money Orders, $33,106.00 in United States Currency, $20,101.00 in United States Currency, $19,156.00 in United States Currency, $8,609.00 in United States Currency, $62,434.00 in United States Currency and 10641 Sedgwick Way, Parker, Colorado
Case Number: 1:2020cv00304
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond as to 15607 East Girard Place, Aurora, Colorado. Answer due 4/6/2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/24/2020. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
March 23, 2020 Filing 17 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,,, for FirstBank to File a Claim by Defendants 10641 Sedgwick Way, Parker, Colorado, 15607 East Girard Place, Aurora, Colorado. (Bartel, Trevor)
March 23, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on behalf of FirstBank by Trevor G. Bartel on behalf of 10641 Sedgwick Way, Parker, Colorado, 15607 East Girard Place, Aurora, ColoradoAttorney Trevor G. Bartel added to party 10641 Sedgwick Way, Parker, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Trevor G. Bartel added to party 15607 East Girard Place, Aurora, Colorado(pty:dft) (Bartel, Trevor)
March 20, 2020 Filing 15 CLAIM by Defendant $12,999.00 in United States Currency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Aal, Ronald)
March 20, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ronald M. Aal on behalf of $12,999.00 in United States CurrencyAttorney Ronald M. Aal added to party $12,999.00 in United States Currency(pty:dft) (Aal, Ronald)
March 20, 2020 Filing 13 CLAIM by Defendant 15607 East Girard Place, Aurora, Colorado. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Aal, Ronald)
March 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ronald M. Aal on behalf of 15607 East Girard Place, Aurora, ColoradoAttorney Ronald M. Aal added to party 15607 East Girard Place, Aurora, Colorado(pty:dft) (Aal, Ronald)
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CLAIM OF HANGBIN ZHENG by Defendant 1792 South Nome Way, Aurora, Colorado (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Hangbin Zheng)(McDermott, Sean)
March 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Hangbin Zheng by Sean Michael McDermott on behalf of 1792 South Nome Way, Aurora, ColoradoAttorney Sean Michael McDermott added to party 1792 South Nome Way, Aurora, Colorado(pty:dft) (McDermott, Sean)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/7/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/7/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (trvo, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 10641 Sedgwick Way, Parker, Colorado by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 1792 South Nome Way, Aurora, Colorado by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
February 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lis Pendens 15607 East Girard Place, Aurora, Colorado by Plaintiff USA (Young, Elizabeth)
February 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in Rem against $1,418.00 in United States Currency, $1,857.00 in United States Currency, $12,999.00 in United States Currency, $14,130.00 in United States Currency, $14,250.00 in United States Currency, $18,590.00 in United States Currency, $19,156.00 in United States Currency, $20,101.00 in United States Currency, $33,000.00 in United States Currency, $33,106.00 in United States Currency, $5,086.00 in United States Currency, $6,567.00 in United States Currency, $62,434.00 in United States Currency, $7,440.00 in United States Currency, $8,609.00 in United States Currency, 10641 Sedgwick Way, Parker, Colorado, 15607 East Girard Place, Aurora, Colorado, 1792 South Nome Way, Aurora, Colorado, 4 Western Union Money Orders Attorney Elizabeth Jane Young added to party USA(pty:pla), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Young, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 15607 East Girard Place, Aurora, Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,250.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $5,086.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,857.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $33,000.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $1,418.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $18,590.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1792 South Nome Way, Aurora, Colorado
Represented By: Sean Michael McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $7,440.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 15607 East Girard Place, Aurora, Colorado
Represented By: Trevor G. Bartel
Represented By: Ronald M. Aal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,567.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $14,130.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $12,999.00 in United States Currency
Represented By: Ronald M. Aal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4 Western Union Money Orders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $33,106.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $20,101.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $19,156.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,609.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $62,434.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10641 Sedgwick Way, Parker, Colorado
Represented By: Trevor G. Bartel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Elizabeth Jane Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?