Briscoe v. Four One Group, LLC, The
Plaintiff: Zachary S Briscoe and Zachary S. Briscoe
Defendant: The Four One Group, LLC and Four One Group, LLC, The
Case Number: 1:2020cv00362
Filed: February 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #11 by Defendant Four One Group, LLC, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - August 20, 2019 Letter, #2 Exhibit B - August 26, 2019 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Email String Between Counsel)(Gokenbach, Jennifer)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/9/20 returnable by Defendant, The Four One Group, LLC as to why the Court should not remand this case back to the District Court for Broomfield County, Colorado, on the basis of untimeliness of removal. Show Cause Response due by 3/30/2020. (nmarb, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,, State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Four One Group, LLC, The (Gokenbach, Jennifer)
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Gokenbach, Jennifer)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Four One Group, LLC, The.(Gokenbach, Jennifer)
February 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gary M. Kramer on behalf of Zachary S. BriscoeAttorney Gary M. Kramer added to party Zachary S. Briscoe(pty:pla) (Kramer, Gary)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons upon The Four One Group, LLC on 01/07/2020. (trvo, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Four One Group, LLC, The, filed by Zachary S. Briscoe.(trvo, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Four One Group, LLC from District Court, Broomfield County, Colorado, Case Number 2019CV30496. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7148463), filed by The Four One Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Service of Exhibit A to Complaint, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Gokenbach, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briscoe v. Four One Group, LLC, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary S Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary S. Briscoe
Represented By: Gary M. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Four One Group, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Four One Group, LLC, The
Represented By: Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?