Bowman v. Finish Line Auto Sales, LLC
Plaintiff: LaTosha Bowman
Defendant: Finish Line Auto Sales, LLC and Finish Line Auto Sales, LLC doing business as Finishline Motors
Case Number: 1:2020cv00483
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1638
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LaTosha Bowman. Finish Line Auto Sales, LLC served on 3/27/2020, answer due 4/17/2020. (Thompson, Russell)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 5/27/2020 10:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/30/2020. (ksena)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/27/2020 10:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/28/2020. (ksena)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/27/2020. Text Only Entry (cmalc1)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00483-CMA. (athom, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Finish Line Auto Sales, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7166681)Attorney Russell S. Thompson, IV added to party LaTosha Bowman(pty:pla), filed by LaTosha Bowman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - RISC, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Thompson, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. Finish Line Auto Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finish Line Auto Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finish Line Auto Sales, LLC doing business as Finishline Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaTosha Bowman
Represented By: Russell S. Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?