Mellman v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Sarah Mellman
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company and Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 1:2020cv00497
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 22 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Sarah Mellman. (Hemmat, Chad)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER Resetting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. During the Court's review of the Proposed Scheduling Order [#20 ], it was apparent that the PSO does not contain any completed sections for the Plaintiff, or an explanation for its absence. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET for 5/7/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The Parties are ORDERED to submit an Amended Proposed Scheduling Order in WORD copy via e-mail (Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov), and via CM/ECF filing by 4/30/2020. This Amendmend PSO shall have all sections completed by all Parties or otherwise explain why certain sections are left blank. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/13/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
April 9, 2020 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Sarah Mellman. (Hemmat, Chad)
April 9, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The All parties do not consent.. (Redmond, Christy)
April 2, 2020 Filing 18 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: MINUTE ORDER. (amont, )
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 11:00 AM shall be conducted TELEPHONICALLY. The Parties shall appear by calling into a Court-provided Conference Call-in number. The Court will email all counsel of record the conference number after the Proposed Scheduling Order has been received. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/2/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
March 2, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The.(Redmond, Christy)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 4/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 4/9/2020. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #7 ) is due 4/9/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/27/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/27/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/27/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
February 26, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE., by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge Raymond P. Moore for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-497-RM (angar, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Max K. Jones, Jr on behalf of Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, TheAttorney Max K. Jones, Jr added to party Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The(pty:dft) (Jones, Max)
February 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cameron Oren Hunter on behalf of Sarah MellmanAttorney Cameron Oren Hunter added to party Sarah Mellman(pty:pla) (Hunter, Cameron)
February 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason Glenn Alleman on behalf of Sarah MellmanAttorney Jason Glenn Alleman added to party Sarah Mellman(pty:pla) (Alleman, Jason)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Chad Patrick Hemmat on behalf of Sarah MellmanAttorney Chad Patrick Hemmat added to party Sarah Mellman(pty:pla) (Hemmat, Chad)
February 25, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (trvo, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons upon The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company on 01/31/2020. (trvo, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The, filed by Sarah Mellman.(trvo, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company from Arapahoe District, Case Number 20-cv-30217. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7169241), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - SOS, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Cover, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Affidavit of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Document Corporate Disclosure Statement, #8 Proposed Document Notice of Filing State Court Docket, #9 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Filing State Court Docket, #10 Proposed Document Notice of Entry of Appearance)(Redmond, Christy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mellman v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Christy Noelle Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Christy Noelle Redmond
Represented By: Max K. Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Mellman
Represented By: Cameron Oren Hunter
Represented By: Chad Patrick Hemmat
Represented By: Jason Glenn Alleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?