Glenwood Springs Citizens' Alliance v. United States Department of Interior et al
Plaintiff: Glenwood Springs Citizens' Alliance
Defendant: Jamie Connell, David Bernhardt, U.S. Bureau of Land Management, William Pendley, Larry Sandoval, Jr. and United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 1:2020cv00658
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Nature of Suit: APA Review/Appeal
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Hosu Kim on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Joseph Hosu Kim added to party David Bernhardt(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Hosu Kim added to party Jamie Connell(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Hosu Kim added to party William Pendley(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Hosu Kim added to party Larry Sandoval, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Hosu Kim added to party U.S. Bureau of Land Management(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Hosu Kim added to party United States Department of the Interior(pty:dft) (Kim, Joseph)
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon Plaintiff's Proof of Service defendant(s) Glenwood Springs Citizens' Alliance served on 3/13/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (Flynn, Roger)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PREPARATION OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/13/2020. ORDERED that on or before the deadline for defendants' response to the complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(2), the parties shall file (using the Notice event in CM/ECF) a proposed Joint Case Management Plan. (sphil, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Flynn, Roger)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Glenwood Springs Citizens' Alliance against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7196599)Attorney Roger Flynn added to party Glenwood Springs Citizens' Alliance(pty:pla), filed by Glenwood Springs Citizens' Alliance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Flynn, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenwood Springs Citizens' Alliance v. United States Department of Interior et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Connell
Represented By: Joseph Hosu Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Joseph Hosu Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Joseph Hosu Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pendley
Represented By: Joseph Hosu Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Sandoval, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph Hosu Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Joseph Hosu Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenwood Springs Citizens' Alliance
Represented By: Roger Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?