Sonohm Licensing LLC v. Avalue Technology Inc.
Plaintiff: Sonohm Licensing LLC
Defendant: Avalue Technology Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00856
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/27/20 GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Avalue Technology Inc. answer due by 6/24/2020.(nmarb, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Sonohm Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bennett, David)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/21/20 GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Avalue Technology Inc. answer due by 5/25/2020.(nmarb, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Plaintiff Sonohm Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bennett, David)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/6/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/16/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/23/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#4] is July 9, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/6/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION (Related Cases Pending in Any Jurisdiction) by David R. Bennett on behalf of Sonohm Licensing LLC (Bennett, David)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Bennett, David)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cmadr, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Avalue Technology Inc. re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Sonohm Licensing LLC. (Bennett, David)
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Avalue Technology Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7225948)Attorney David R. Bennett added to party Sonohm Licensing LLC(pty:pla), filed by Sonohm Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,651,207, #2 Exhibit B - Resp to Office Action 12/16/2002 ('207 patent), #3 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,106,705, #4 Exhibit B - Resp to Office Action 12/30/2005 ('705 patent), #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bennett, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonohm Licensing LLC v. Avalue Technology Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonohm Licensing LLC
Represented By: David R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalue Technology Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?