Pittman v. No Named Defendants
Plaintiff: Darnell Love Pittman, Sr.
Defendant: No Named Defendants
Case Number: 1:2020cv00860
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/13/2020. The Clerk of the Court is directed to correct the Docket in this case. Plaintiffs Inmate Register No. is 30282-160 and not 05825-045. The Clerk of the Court also is directed to resend to Plaintiff ECF Nos. 3, 4, 5, and 6 at the address that includes the proper inmate register number. (forms mailed as ordered). (sphil, ) Modified on 4/14/2020 to edit text. (sphil, ).
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #5 Order Dismissing Case, Order Reassigning Case, #6 Clerk's Judgment Addressed to Darnell Love Pittman Sr. (sphil, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: 4 Case Assigned to Judge, #3 Case Transferred In - District Transfer Addressed to Darnell Love Pittman Sr.. (tsher, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL on 4/2/2020. (sphil, )
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The Complaint and action are repetitious and are dismissed with prejudice as legally frivolous pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). IFP on appeal is DENIED, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/2/2020. (sphil, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-01193. File, transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 30, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas terminated from case. (dob) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 3/30/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Case electronically transferred to District of Colorado.(dob) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 3/30/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING this action to theUNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OFCOLORADO, along with all orders, motions, affidavits, pleadings and exhibits (ifany) filed herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 3/30/2020. (dob) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 3/30/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Submission of #1 Complaint for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 3/30/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Darnell Love Pittman, Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 3/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pittman v. No Named Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darnell Love Pittman, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Named Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?