Boulter v. Noble Energy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mike Boulter, Ralph Nix Produce, Inc., Barclay Farms, LLC and Boulter LLC
Defendant: Noble Energy, Inc. and Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LP
Case Number: 1:2020cv00861
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shannon Nicole Smith on behalf of Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LPAttorney Shannon Nicole Smith added to party Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LP(pty:dft) (Smith, Shannon)
May 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anthony N. Kaim on behalf of Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LPAttorney Anthony N. Kaim added to party Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LP(pty:dft) (Kaim, Anthony)
May 11, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Barrett H. Reasoner on behalf of Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LPAttorney Barrett H. Reasoner added to party Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LP(pty:dft) (Reasoner, Barrett)
May 5, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LP.. (Williams, Ezekiel)
May 5, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Spencer Reilly Allen on behalf of Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LPAttorney Spencer Reilly Allen added to party Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LP(pty:dft) (Allen, Spencer)
May 5, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carlos R. Romo on behalf of Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LPAttorney Carlos R. Romo added to party Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LP(pty:dft) (Romo, Carlos)
May 5, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ezekiel J. Williams on behalf of Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LPAttorney Ezekiel J. Williams added to party Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LP(pty:dft) (Williams, Ezekiel)
April 29, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rauchway, Jonathan)
April 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gabrielle Lyn Robbie on behalf of Noble Energy, Inc.Attorney Gabrielle Lyn Robbie added to party Noble Energy, Inc.(pty:dft) (Robbie, Gabrielle)
April 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Robert Henderson on behalf of Noble Energy, Inc. (Henderson, James)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shannon Wells Stevenson on behalf of Noble Energy, Inc.Attorney Shannon Wells Stevenson added to party Noble Energy, Inc.(pty:dft) (Stevenson, Shannon)
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Noble Energy, Inc.. Noble Energy, Inc. answer due 5/29/2020. (Rauchway, Jonathan)
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mike Boulter, Barclay Farms, LLC, Ralph Nix Produce, Inc.. Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LP served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Barton, George)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mike Boulter, Boulter LLC. Noble Energy, Inc. served on 4/17/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Barton, George)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued by Clerk on 4/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Summons) (angar, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Noble Energy, Inc., Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LP Attorney George A. Barton added to party Boulter LLC(pty:pla), Attorney George A. Barton added to party Ralph Nix Produce, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney George A. Barton added to party Barclay Farms, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Mike Boulter, Boulter LLC, Barclay Farms, LLC, Ralph Nix Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Barton, George)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/1/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/14/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/21/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (nmarb, )
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/ 1/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Mix, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/1/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Noble Energy, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7227041)Attorney George A. Barton added to party Mike Boulter(pty:pla), filed by Mike Boulter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Barton, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boulter v. Noble Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Energy, Inc.
Represented By: James Robert Henderson
Represented By: Shannon Wells Stevenson
Represented By: Jonathan William Rauchway
Represented By: Gabrielle Lyn Robbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore LP
Represented By: Barrett H. Reasoner
Represented By: Carlos R. Romo
Represented By: Shannon Nicole Smith
Represented By: Ezekiel J. Williams
Represented By: Spencer Reilly Allen
Represented By: Anthony N. Kaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Boulter
Represented By: George A. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Nix Produce, Inc.
Represented By: George A. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barclay Farms, LLC
Represented By: George A. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boulter LLC
Represented By: George A. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?