Leavy v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The et al
Plaintiff: Shelley D. Leavy
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The, Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Sisters of Charity of Leavenworth Health System, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00876
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 26 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER The parties shall participate in the Scheduling Conference for 6/3/2020 09:00 AM TELEPHONICALLY by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The Court thanks the parties in advance for their patience and flexibility as the Court implements this new technology. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/26/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ringel, Andrew)
April 24, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by Sisters of Charity of Leavenworth Health System, Inc..(Ringel, Andrew)
April 24, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Rademaekers, Iwana)
April 10, 2020 Filing 21 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #20 Amended Complaint filed by attorney A. Craig Fleishman. The format for the attorneys signature block is not correct. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT 2nd against All Defendants, filed by Shelley D. Leavy.(Fleishman, A.)
April 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Submission of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendants Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(Rademaekers, Iwana)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 4/7/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00876-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion Regarding Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The deadline for Defendants Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Lincoln National Life Insurance Company to respond to the operative complaint is extended until 4/28/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/06/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The All parties do not consent.. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
April 6, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendants Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rademaekers, Iwana)
April 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by A. Craig Fleishman on behalf of Shelley D. LeavyAttorney A. Craig Fleishman added to party Shelley D. Leavy(pty:pla) (Fleishman, A.)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #4 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The deadline for Defendant Sisters of Charity of Leavenworth Health System, Inc. to respond to the Amended Complaint is extended until 4/28/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/02/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Sisters of Charity of Leavenworth Health System, Inc.. (Ringel, Andrew)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kendra K. Smith on behalf of Sisters of Charity of Leavenworth Health System, Inc.Attorney Kendra K. Smith added to party Sisters of Charity of Leavenworth Health System, Inc.(pty:dft) (Smith, Kendra)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew David Ringel on behalf of Sisters of Charity of Leavenworth Health System, Inc.Attorney Andrew David Ringel added to party Sisters of Charity of Leavenworth Health System, Inc.(pty:dft) (Ringel, Andrew)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #6 Order, 2 Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases,, 3 Case Assigned to Judge, #5 Magistrate Judge, #4 Complaint by Defendants Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/3/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 5/20/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/27/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/31/2020. (jgonz, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 Amended COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The, Sisters of Charity of Leavenworth Health System, Inc., filed by Shelley D. Leavy.(trvo, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 20CV30913. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7229439), filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit A-3, #4 Exhibit A-4, #5 Exhibit A-5, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rademaekers, Iwana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leavy v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley D. Leavy
Represented By: A. Craig Fleishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Iwana M. Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Iwana M. Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sisters of Charity of Leavenworth Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew David Ringel
Represented By: Kendra K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?