Smith v. Trujillo et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Smith
Defendant: No Named Defendants, A Trujillo, Dr. Pelton, Ms. Lindgren, United States of America, C. McClinton, Gonzalez and Dr. Resto
Case Number: 1:2020cv00877
Filed: March 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gonzalez, Ms. Lindgren, C. McClinton, No Named Defendants, Dr. Pelton, Dr. Resto, A Trujillo, United States of America, filed by Joseph Smith.(apesa, )
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #19 ), filed on May 6, 2020, is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file an amended Prisoner Complaint, on the court-approved form, in compliance with the April 21, 2020 Order (ECF No. #14 ), on or before June 5, 2020, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/8/2020.(angar, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time, by Plaintiff Joseph Smith. (angar, )
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintif's Motion for Reconsideration (ECF No. #16 ) of the April 20, 2020, Order Granting Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #13 ), is construed as a motion to waive the initial partial filing fee in this action and is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall not be required to pay an initial partial filing fee in this action, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/1/2020.(angar, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION Requesting Jury Trial Demand, by Plaintiff Joseph Smith. (angar, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Reconsideration, by Plaintiff Joseph Smith. (angar, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED Prisoner COMPLAINT against Gonzalez, A Trujillo, filed by Joseph Smith.(angar, )
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Mr. Smith fails to file an amended Prisoner Complaint on the court-approved Prisoner Complaint form within the time allowed, the Court may dismiss some of this action without further notice for the reasons discussed above, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/21/2020. (angar, )
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #8 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/20/2020.(angar, )
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER. On April 15, 2020, Mr. Smith filed a Motion for Leave to File Complaint in Addition to the Current Court-Approved Prisoner Complaint form (ECF No. #6 ). The Motion is DENIED. Mr. Smith's Motion for Appointment of Volunteer Counsel (ECF No. #9 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature because this case is in initial review. Mr. Smiths Motion for Copies of Exhibits (ECF No. #7 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/17/2020.(angar, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Gonzalez, A Trujillo, filed by Joseph Smith.(angar, ) Modified on 4/20/2020 to correct text (angar, ).
April 15, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Plaintiff Joseph Smith. (angar, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Copies of Exhibits (6), by Plaintiff Joseph Smith. (angar, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File a Complaint in Addition to the Current Court Approved Prisoner Complaint Form, by Plaintiff Joseph Smith. (angar, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER by Plaintiff Joseph Smith. (angar, )
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Appointment of Volunteer Counsel, by Plaintiff Joseph Smith. (angar, )
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER On April 1, 2020, the Court issued an Order directing Plaintiff to cure filing deficiencies within 30 days. (ECF No. #3 ). On April 9, 2020, Plaintiff filed pro se a Letter (ECF No. #4 ) in which he indicates that he does not have access to the necessary documents. The clerk of the court is directed to send Plaintiff copies of the Prisoner's Complaint packet and the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Mr. Smith shall cure the filing deficiencies, in compliance with the April 1 Order, within 30 days from the date of this minute order. Failure to comply may result in dismissal of this action without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/10/2020. (evana, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER To the Court, by Plaintiff Joseph Smith. (nmarb, )
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/1/2020. (angar, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 1 LETTER by Plaintiff Joseph Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Trujillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: No Named Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Pelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Lindgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. McClinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Resto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?