Valyrian IP LLC v. RingCentral Inc.
Plaintiff: Valyrian IP LLC
Defendant: RingCentral Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00892
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Valyrian IP LLC All parties consent.. (Anderson, Kirk)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/13/2020. Consent Form due by 7/3/2020. Scheduling Conference is VACATED and RESET to 7/23/2020 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Valyrian IP LLC. RingCentral Inc. waiver sent on 4/30/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Anderson, Kirk)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/2/2020. Consent Form due by 5/13/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cmadr, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Valyrian IP LLC (Anderson, Kirk)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to RinCentral Inc. c/o InCorp Services, Inc. by Plaintiff Valyrian IP LLC. (Anderson, Kirk)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Anderson, Kirk)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against RingCentral Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7232148)Attorney Kirk J. Anderson added to party Valyrian IP LLC(pty:pla), filed by Valyrian IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anderson, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valyrian IP LLC v. RingCentral Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RingCentral Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valyrian IP LLC
Represented By: Kirk J. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?