Joseph v. Liberty Oilfield Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marc Joseph
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, RIC IV Liberty Holdings, L.P., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, N. John Lancaster, Jesal Shah, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Michael Stock, Cary D. Steinbeck, Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, LLC, Intrepid Partners, LLC, Liberty Oilfield Services, Inc., Christopher A. Wright, Peter A. Dea, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Brett Staffieri, Piper Sandler & Co., RIC Energy IV Direct Partnership, L.P., Ken Babcock, Evercore Group L.L.C., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc., William F. Kimble, Petrie Partners Securities, LLC and N. John Lancaster, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00946
Filed: April 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #34 Stipulation by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/29/20. (jdyne, )
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Adams McGee on behalf of Ken Babcock, Peter A. Dea, William F. Kimble, N. John Lancaster, Jr, Liberty Oilfield Services, Inc., RIC Energy IV Direct Partnership, L.P., RIC IV Liberty Holdings, L.P., Jesal Shah, Brett Staffieri, Cary D. Steinbeck, Michael Stock, Christopher A. WrightAttorney Matthew Adams McGee added to party Ken Babcock(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Adams McGee added to party Peter A. Dea(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Adams McGee added to party William F. Kimble(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Adams McGee added to party N. John Lancaster, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Adams McGee added to party Liberty Oilfield Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Adams McGee added to party RIC Energy IV Direct Partnership, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Adams McGee added to party RIC IV Liberty Holdings, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Adams McGee added to party Jesal Shah(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Adams McGee added to party Brett Staffieri(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Adams McGee added to party Cary D. Steinbeck(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Adams McGee added to party Michael Stock(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Adams McGee added to party Christopher A. Wright(pty:dft) (McGee, Matthew)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Benjamin Gregory Goodman on behalf of Ken Babcock, Peter A. Dea, William F. Kimble, N. John Lancaster, Jr, Liberty Oilfield Services, Inc., RIC Energy IV Direct Partnership, L.P., RIC IV Liberty Holdings, L.P., Jesal Shah, Brett Staffieri, Cary D. Steinbeck, Michael Stock, Christopher A. WrightAttorney Benjamin Gregory Goodman added to party Ken Babcock(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Gregory Goodman added to party Peter A. Dea(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Gregory Goodman added to party William F. Kimble(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Gregory Goodman added to party N. John Lancaster, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Gregory Goodman added to party Liberty Oilfield Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Gregory Goodman added to party RIC Energy IV Direct Partnership, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Gregory Goodman added to party RIC IV Liberty Holdings, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Gregory Goodman added to party Jesal Shah(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Gregory Goodman added to party Brett Staffieri(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Gregory Goodman added to party Cary D. Steinbeck(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Gregory Goodman added to party Michael Stock(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin Gregory Goodman added to party Christopher A. Wright(pty:dft) (Goodman, Benjamin)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Howard Gold on behalf of Ken Babcock, Peter A. Dea, William F. Kimble, N. John Lancaster, Jr, Liberty Oilfield Services, Inc., RIC Energy IV Direct Partnership, L.P., RIC IV Liberty Holdings, L.P., Jesal Shah, Brett Staffieri, Cary D. Steinbeck, Michael Stock, Christopher A. WrightAttorney Daniel Howard Gold added to party Ken Babcock(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Howard Gold added to party Peter A. Dea(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Howard Gold added to party William F. Kimble(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Howard Gold added to party N. John Lancaster, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Howard Gold added to party Liberty Oilfield Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Howard Gold added to party RIC Energy IV Direct Partnership, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Howard Gold added to party RIC IV Liberty Holdings, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Howard Gold added to party Jesal Shah(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Howard Gold added to party Brett Staffieri(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Howard Gold added to party Cary D. Steinbeck(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Howard Gold added to party Michael Stock(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Howard Gold added to party Christopher A. Wright(pty:dft) (Gold, Daniel)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Richard Thaddeus Behrens on behalf of Ken Babcock, Peter A. Dea, William F. Kimble, N. John Lancaster, Jr, Liberty Oilfield Services, Inc., RIC Energy IV Direct Partnership, L.P., RIC IV Liberty Holdings, L.P., Jesal Shah, Brett Staffieri, Cary D. Steinbeck, Michael Stock, Christopher A. WrightAttorney Richard Thaddeus Behrens added to party Ken Babcock(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Thaddeus Behrens added to party Peter A. Dea(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Thaddeus Behrens added to party William F. Kimble(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Thaddeus Behrens added to party N. John Lancaster, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Thaddeus Behrens added to party Liberty Oilfield Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Thaddeus Behrens added to party RIC Energy IV Direct Partnership, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Thaddeus Behrens added to party RIC IV Liberty Holdings, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Thaddeus Behrens added to party Jesal Shah(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Thaddeus Behrens added to party Brett Staffieri(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Thaddeus Behrens added to party Cary D. Steinbeck(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Thaddeus Behrens added to party Michael Stock(pty:dft), Attorney Richard Thaddeus Behrens added to party Christopher A. Wright(pty:dft) (Behrens, Richard)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER re: #34 STIPULATION Stipulated Motion Regarding Service of Complaint and Setting Uniform Schedule for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/11/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION Stipulated Motion Regarding Service of Complaint and Setting Uniform Schedule for Defendants to Respond to Complaint by Defendants Ken Babcock, Peter A. Dea, William F. Kimble, N. John Lancaster, Jr, Liberty Oilfield Services, Inc., RIC Energy IV Direct Partnership, L.P., RIC IV Liberty Holdings, L.P., Jesal Shah, Brett Staffieri, Cary D. Steinbeck, Michael Stock, Christopher A. Wright. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Johnston, Lee)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. In light of the decline of consent to a magistrate judge by one or more of the parties in this case and its reassignment to this Court, the Scheduling Conference set June 22, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak is VACATED. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date within 14 days of the date of this order. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/23/2020. (rbjsec. )
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-946-RBJ (angar, )
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #30 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00946-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Ken Babcock, Peter A. Dea, William F. Kimble, N. John Lancaster, Jr, Liberty Oilfield Services, Inc., RIC Energy IV Direct Partnership, L.P., RIC IV Liberty Holdings, L.P., Jesal Shah, Brett Staffieri, Cary D. Steinbeck, Michael Stock, Christopher A. Wright All parties do not consent.. (Johnston, Lee)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMONS REQUEST as to RIC IV Liberty Holdings, L.P. re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS REQUEST as to RIC Energy IV Direct Partnership, L.P. re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS REQUEST as to SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Petrie Partners Securities, LLC re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Intrepid Partners, LLC re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, LLC re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Piper Sandler & Co. re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Evercore Group L.L.C. re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS REQUEST as to J.P. Morgan Securities LLC re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Citigroup Global Markets Inc. re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Wells Fargo Securities, LLC re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jesal Shah re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Ken Babcock re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Brett Staffieri re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to N. John Lancaster, Jr. re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Peter A. Dea re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to William F. Kimble re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Cary D. Steinbeck re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Michael Stock re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Christopher A. Wright re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Liberty Oilfield Services, Inc. re #1 Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Marc Joseph. (Kim, Phillip)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/22/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 6/8/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 6/15/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 4/6/2020. (jgonz, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. Summons not issued. All defendants must be listed and a summons must be prepared for each named defendant. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (trvo, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ken Babcock, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Peter A. Dea, Evercore Group L.L.C., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc., Intrepid Partners, LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, William F. Kimble, N. John Lancaster, Liberty Oilfield Services, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Petrie Partners Securities, LLC, Piper Sandler & Co., RIC Energy IV Direct Partnership, L.P., RIC IV Liberty Holdings, L.P., Jesal Shah, Brett Staffieri, Cary D. Steinbeck, Michael Stock, SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc., Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Christopher A. Wright (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7236814)Attorney Phillip C. Kim added to party Marc Joseph(pty:pla), filed by Marc Joseph. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kim, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joseph v. Liberty Oilfield Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIC IV Liberty Holdings, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Howard Gold
Represented By: Benjamin Gregory Goodman
Represented By: Lee Frederick Johnston
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. John Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesal Shah
Represented By: Daniel Howard Gold
Represented By: Benjamin Gregory Goodman
Represented By: Lee Frederick Johnston
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Robinson Humphrey, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Stock
Represented By: Daniel Howard Gold
Represented By: Benjamin Gregory Goodman
Represented By: Lee Frederick Johnston
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cary D. Steinbeck
Represented By: Daniel Howard Gold
Represented By: Benjamin Gregory Goodman
Represented By: Lee Frederick Johnston
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tudor, Pickering, Holt & Co. Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intrepid Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Oilfield Services, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Howard Gold
Represented By: Benjamin Gregory Goodman
Represented By: Lee Frederick Johnston
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wright
Represented By: Daniel Howard Gold
Represented By: Benjamin Gregory Goodman
Represented By: Lee Frederick Johnston
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Dea
Represented By: Daniel Howard Gold
Represented By: Benjamin Gregory Goodman
Represented By: Lee Frederick Johnston
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Staffieri
Represented By: Daniel Howard Gold
Represented By: Benjamin Gregory Goodman
Represented By: Lee Frederick Johnston
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Piper Sandler & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIC Energy IV Direct Partnership, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Howard Gold
Represented By: Benjamin Gregory Goodman
Represented By: Lee Frederick Johnston
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Babcock
Represented By: Daniel Howard Gold
Represented By: Benjamin Gregory Goodman
Represented By: Lee Frederick Johnston
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evercore Group L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F. Kimble
Represented By: Daniel Howard Gold
Represented By: Benjamin Gregory Goodman
Represented By: Lee Frederick Johnston
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petrie Partners Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. John Lancaster, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Howard Gold
Represented By: Benjamin Gregory Goodman
Represented By: Lee Frederick Johnston
Represented By: Matthew Adams McGee
Represented By: Richard Thaddeus Behrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Joseph
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?