Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. 5411 Leetsdale LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Justin T. Henry, 5411 Leetsdale LLC and 5411 Leetsdale LLC doing business as The Watering Bowl
Case Number: 1:2020cv00958
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/20/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 6/15/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/22/2020. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 6/29/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 5411 Leetsdale LLC, Justin T. Henry (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7238581)Attorney Ryan Richard Janis added to party Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons 5411 Leetsdale LLC, #3 Summons Justin T. Henry, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Janis, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. 5411 Leetsdale LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin T. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5411 Leetsdale LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5411 Leetsdale LLC doing business as The Watering Bowl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Richard Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?