Smith v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas
Plaintiff: David Smith
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas
Case Number: 1:2020cv00974
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 28:1441eb
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas A. Lidbury on behalf of Blue Cross Blue Shield of TexasAttorney Thomas A. Lidbury added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas(pty:dft) (Lidbury, Thomas)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/11/2020. Discovery due by 9/1/2020. (tsher, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 16 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 5/11/2020. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER Due to current concerns regarding potential transmission of COVID-19, during the week of May 11, 2020, all hearings and conferences in matters before Magistrate Judge Hegarty will be conducted by telephone unless otherwise requested by counsel or a pro se party. Counsel and any unrepresented non-prisoner parties shall appear at the conference by telephone by calling the following conference line at the appointed time: Number:888-278-0296 Access code:8212991# Counsel for Defendant(s) in any prisoner action shall attempt to arrange a teleconference with the corrections facility first before calling my chambers at the appointed time. Any questions regarding this procedure may be directed to my chambers at 303-844-4507 or at hegarty_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/04/2020. Text Only Entry (mehlc1, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff David Smith. (Baldwin, Robert)
April 16, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff David Smith All parties do not consent.. (Cortes, Michelle)
April 14, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas.(Wallach, Abigail)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/8/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/8/2020. Text Only Entry (cpear)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/8/2020. Text Only Entry (cpear)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michelle B. Cortes on behalf of David SmithAttorney Michelle B. Cortes added to party David Smith(pty:pla) (Cortes, Michelle)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert M. Baldwin on behalf of David SmithAttorney Robert M. Baldwin added to party David Smith(pty:pla) (Baldwin, Robert)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cmadr, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas, filed by David Smith.(cmadr, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Health Care Services Corporation for Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas. (Wallach, Abigail)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas from Arapahoe County District, Case Number 2020cv030571. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7240442), filed by Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint (filed in state court), #2 Exhibit Summons (filed in state court), #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet (filed in state court), #4 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wallach, Abigail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas
Represented By: Abigail S. Wallach
Represented By: Thomas A. Lidbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Smith
Represented By: Robert M. Baldwin
Represented By: Michelle B. Cortes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?