Jenkins v. Executive Director of CDOC et al
Petitioner: Owdia Jenkins
Respondent: Executive Director of CDOC and LaVista Correctional Facility Warden
Case Number: 1:2020cv01013
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241st
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 10 Preliminary RESPONSE to #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Attorney Jennifer S. Huss added to party Executive Director of CDOC(pty:res), Attorney Jennifer S. Huss added to party LaVista Correctional Facility Warden(pty:res)Attorney Jennifer S. Huss added to party Executive Director of CDOC(pty:res), Attorney Jennifer S. Huss added to party LaVista Correctional Facility Warden(pty:res) by Executive Director of CDOC, LaVista Correctional Facility Warden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 - Order and Petition in El Paso 2020CV41)(Huss, Jennifer)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE of Service of Order to File Preliminary Response upon Dean Williams on 5/4/2020 (evana, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by E- MAIL by Clerk of Court re #7 Minute Order, to Attorney General, Colorado Attorney General's Office, First Assistant Attorney General Colorado Attorney General's Office and Executive Director of CDOC and LaVista Correctional Facility. Text Only Entry (evana, )
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER sua sponte will provide additional time to comply with the Order to File Preliminary Response (ECF No. #5 ). Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Minute Order, Respondents shall file a Preliminary Response that complies with the Order to File Preliminary Response (ECF No. #5 ). Applicant may file a Reply, if she desires, within twenty-one (21) days of the filing of the Response, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/4/2020. (evana, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #5 Order to File Preliminary Response #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Service of Process. (trvo, )
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO FILE PRELIMINARY RESPONSE within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, Respondents shall file a Preliminary Response that complies with this Order. That within twenty-one (21) days of the filing of the Response, Applicant may file a Reply, if she desires, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/10/2020. (evana, )
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #2 the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App. P. 24 in a Habeas Corpus Action (ECF No. #2 ), construed as a Prisoners Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/10/2020.(evana, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App. P. 24 in a Habeas Corpus Action. by Petitioner Owdia Jenkins. (trvo, )
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Owdia Jenkins.(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Executive Director of CDOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Executive Director of CDOC
Represented By: Jennifer S. Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LaVista Correctional Facility Warden
Represented By: Jennifer S. Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Owdia Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?