Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. v. Colorado Farms LLC et al
Plaintiff: Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.
Defendant: Ranko Mocevic, Colorado Homes LLC, Eric Keiter and Colorado Farms LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01023
Filed: April 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #7 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.. (Groen, Christopher)
May 19, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.. Eric Keiter served on 4/28/2020, answer due 5/19/2020. (Groen, Christopher)
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.. Eric Keiter served on 4/20/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Groen, Christopher) Modified on 5/19/2020 to note that this document was re-filed as doc #13 (athom, ).
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.. Ranko Mocevic served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020. (Groen, Christopher)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Colorado Farms LLC re #7 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.. (Groen, Christopher)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER re: #6 Response to Order to Show Cause by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/28/2020. #5 Order to Show Cause is discharged Consent Form due by 6/4/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2020 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eric Keiter, Ranko Mocevic, Colorado Farms LLC, filed by Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons Colorado Farms LLC)(Groen, Christopher)
April 27, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #5 by Plaintiff Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Groen, Christopher)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/13/2020 returnable by Plaintiff Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. as to why should not dismiss the case without prejudice for the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction due to Plaintiff's failure to show complete diversity in the Complaint. Show Cause Response due by 4/27/2020. (tsher, ) Modified on 4/28/2020 to show as discharged pursuant to #8 Minute Order.(tsher, ).
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Colorado Homes llc; Ranko Mocevic; Eric Keiter re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Groen, Christopher)
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Colorado Homes llc, Eric Keiter, Ranko Mocevic (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7245940)Attorney Christopher T. Groen added to party Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Groen, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. v. Colorado Farms LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Groen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranko Mocevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Homes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Keiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Farms LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?