100%, LLC v. Tinkey
Plaintiff: 100%, LLC
Defendant: Michael W. Tinkey, D.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01027
Filed: April 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff 100%, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit F. Joseph Dunn, Esq., #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit)(Dunn, Francis)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of the plaintiff 100%, LLC and the defendant against Michael W. Tinkey, DC by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/21/20. (jdyne, )
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Default Judgment. The order will enter by separate entry. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/21/2020. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Michael W. Tinkey, D.C. by Plaintiff 100%, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dr. Jason Helfrich, #2 Exhibit A to Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B to Affidavit, #4 Exhibit C to Affidavit, #5 Exhibit D to Affidavit, #6 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Dunn, Francis)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Michael W. Tinkey, DC re #6 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Michael W. Tinkey, D.C., by Clerk. Text Only Entry (apesa, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Michael W. Tinkey, D.C. by Plaintiff 100%, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit F. Joseph Dunn, Esq.)(Dunn, Francis)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 100%, LLC. Michael W. Tinkey, DC served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020. (Dunn, Francis)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/13/2020. (rbjsec. )
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael W Tinkey (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7246427)Attorney Francis Joseph Dunn, IV added to party 100%, LLC(pty:pla), filed by 100%, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Guaranty of Franchise Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Loan Documents, #4 Exhibit D - Loan Guaranty, #5 Exhibit E - Termination Notifce, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunn, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 100%, LLC v. Tinkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W. Tinkey, D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 100%, LLC
Represented By: Francis Joseph Dunn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?