Carmody v. MediaNews Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bryan Carmody
Defendant: MediaNews Group, Inc.
Interested Party: Richard P Liebowitz
Case Number: 1:2020cv01056
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Filing 20 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to Minute Order #16. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Plaintiff Bryan Carmody (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liebowitz, Richard)
June 9, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to 14 ADVISORY Notice to Attorney(s), by Interested Party Richard P Liebowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(McConnell, Michael)
June 9, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael T. McConnell on behalf of Richard P LiebowitzAttorney Michael T. McConnell added to party Richard P Liebowitz(pty:ip) (McConnell, Michael)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i), which requires no further action on the part of the Court. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/9/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
June 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case and Notice of Settlement by Plaintiff Bryan Carmody (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: An Order of Disbarment was entered against RICHARD P. LIEBOWITZ by the Northern District of California. Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(c), the clerk of this court shall make a notation in the court record of such lack of good standing and hereby informs counsel and the court of counsel's ineligibility to practice before the court. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER re: #11 Notice of Settlement filed by MediaNews Group, Inc. In light of the Notice of Settlement, the Scheduling Conference is VACATED. The parties shall file their Dismissal Papers by 6/29/2020. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/28/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc1)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. MediaNews Group, Inc. answer due 6/10/2010. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/28/2020. Text Only Entry(skclc1)
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant MediaNews Group, Inc. (Kissinger, Ashley)
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant MediaNews Group, Inc.. (Kissinger, Ashley)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 6/29/2020. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #6 ) is due 6/29/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/4/2020. Text Only Entry (amont, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant MediaNews Group, Inc.. MediaNews Group, Inc. answer due 5/27/2010. (Kissinger, Ashley)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ashley I. Kissinger on behalf of MediaNews Group, Inc.Attorney Ashley I. Kissinger added to party MediaNews Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Kissinger, Ashley)
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1056-SKC (angar, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (cmadr, )
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MediaNews Group, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7251453)Attorney Richard P. Liebowitz added to party Bryan Carmody(pty:pla), filed by Bryan Carmody. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmody v. MediaNews Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Carmody
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MediaNews Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley I. Kissinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Richard P Liebowitz
Represented By: Michael T. McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?