Scott v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Marino B. Scott
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons, F.B.O.P Inmate Lock Box and F.D.C. Englewood Colo.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01075
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended Complaint that complies with the directives in this Order within the time allowed, this action may be dismissed without further notice for the reasons discussed above. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/26/2020. (rvill, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #8 ) is granted. The Motion to File 42 U.S.C. 1983 Civil ProcedureWithout Filing Fee(s) (ECF No. #2 ) is denied. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/26/2020. (rvill, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Marino B. Scott. (rvill, )
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff is directed to submit, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Minute Order, an Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), which is the court-approved in forma pauperis form used by nonprisoners. In the alternative, Plaintiff may pay the $400.00 filing fee. Plaintiff is advised that this action will be dismissed without further notice if he fails to either pay the $400.00 filing fee or file the nonprisoner in forma pauperis motion on the court approvedform within the time allowed. The Prisoners Motion and Affidavit for Leave toProceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #6 ), filed by Plaintiff on May 7, 2020, is deficient because it is not on the court-approved form used by nonprisoners. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/12/2020. (Forms mailed as Ordered) (rvill, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Marino B. Scott. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rvill, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Plaintiff Marino B. Scott. (rvill, )
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. ORDERED that Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number provided on this order. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 04/17/2020. (rvill, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Motion to File 42 U.S.C. 1983 Civil Procedure Without Filing Fee(s) by Plaintiff Marino B. Scott. (cmadr, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against F.B.O.P Inmate Lock Box, F.D.C. Englewood Colo., Federal Bureau of Prisons, filed by Marino B. Scott.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.B.O.P Inmate Lock Box
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.D.C. Englewood Colo.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marino B. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?