Honeyman Cipher Solutions LLC v. Slack Technologies Inc.
Plaintiff: Honeyman Cipher Solutions LLC
Defendant: Slack Technologies Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01076
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 4/30/20. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Honeyman Cipher Solutions LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rabicoff, Isaac)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/20/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 6/15/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 6/18/2020. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/2/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (trvo, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isaac Philip Rabicoff on behalf of Honeyman Cipher Solutions LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Slack Technologies Inc re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Honeyman Cipher Solutions LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Patent Infringement against Slack Technologies Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7253637)Attorney Isaac Philip Rabicoff added to party Honeyman Cipher Solutions LLC(pty:pla), filed by Honeyman Cipher Solutions LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2a, #3 Exhibit 2b, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Honeyman Cipher Solutions LLC v. Slack Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honeyman Cipher Solutions LLC
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slack Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?