Weinman v. Cordova
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Weinman
Defendant: Doris Cordova
In Re: Maximinio Cordova
Interested Party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Case Number: 1:2020cv01116
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Defendant's Reply Regarding Motion to Withdraw Reference and Request for Trial by Jury ("Reply") #7 . The Court normally would have stricken Defendant's Reply for asserting a new argument regarding "core" or "non-core" claims not raised in her opening brief. See Starkey ex rel. A.B. v. Boulder Cnty. Soc. Servs., 569 F.3d 1244, 1259 (10th Cir. 2009) ("A party may not raise, and the Court will not consider, truly new arguments asserted in a reply brief."). However, solely in the interests of justice, the Court will consider Defendant's Reply as if it were an opening brief on the issue of whether this matter involves core or non-core claims. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a Response to Defendant's Reply, not to exceed 10 pages, on or before June 26, 2020. Upon receipt of Plaintiff's Response, the Court will consider whether additional briefing on this topic is necessary. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/15/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmlc2)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Defendant Doris Cordova. (Sender, Katharine)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Defendant's Motion to Withdraw Reference and Request for Trial by Jury #1 . The Defendant is DIRECTED to file a Reply in support of her Motion on or before April 29, 2020. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/21/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Referral of #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference. (trvo, )
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Clerk to Refer #1 Motion for Withdrawal of the Reference to the District Court by United States Bankruptcy Court Judge Elizabeth E. Brown on 04/20/2020. (trvo, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 RESPONSE to #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference and Request for Trial by Jury filed by Plaintiff Jeffrey A. Weinman. (trvo, )
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference and Request for Trial by Jury by Defendant Doris Cordova. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weinman v. Cordova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Maximinio Cordova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Weinman
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doris Cordova
Represented By: Katharine Sara Sender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?