Jamieson v. Hoven Vision LLC
Plaintiff: Jana Dillon Jamieson
Defendant: Hoven Vision LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01122
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Jana Dillon Jamieson. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 18, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Craig Benjamin Sanders on behalf of Jana Dillon JamiesonAttorney Craig Benjamin Sanders added to party Jana Dillon Jamieson(pty:pla) (Sanders, Craig)
June 12, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and for Sanctions or, in the Alternative, to Stay Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Counsel's Suspension from Practicing by Defendant Hoven Vision LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jeffrey Sehgal in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Lechner, Coleman)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER. On June 3, 2020, an Advisory Notice was issued by the Clerk of Court informing Richard P. Liebowitz that he was no longer in good standing in the District Court for the District of Colorado. Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(c), [a]n attorney who is not in good standing shall not practice before the bar of this court or continue to be an attorney of record in any pending case. Any application for relief from the rule of good standing must comply with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(d) and D.C.COLO.LAttyR 6(c). Mr. Liebowitzs response to the Advisory Notice shall be referred to the Committee on Conduct under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(d) and D.C.COLO.LAttyR 6(c). by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/12/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Plaintiff Jana Dillon Jamieson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liebowitz, Richard)
June 9, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to 9 ADVISORY Notice to Attorney(s), 10 ADVISORY Notice to Attorney(s), by Interested Party Richard P Liebowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(McConnell, Michael)
June 9, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael T. McConnell on behalf of Richard P LiebowitzAttorney Michael T. McConnell added to party Richard P Liebowitz(pty:ip) (McConnell, Michael)
June 3, 2020 Filing 10 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: An Order of Disbarment was entered against RICHARD P. LIEBOWITZ by the Northern District of California. Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(c), the clerk of this court shall make a notation in the court record of such lack of good standing and hereby informs counsel and the court of counsel's ineligibility to practice before the court. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 ADVISORY ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: An Order of Disbarment was entered against RICHARD P. LIEBOWITZ by the Northern District of California. Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(c), the clerk of this court shall make a notation in the court record of such lack of good standing and hereby informs counsel and the court of counsel's ineligibility to practice before the court. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Hoven Vision LLC. Hoven Vision LLC answer due 6/12/2020. (Lechner, Coleman)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Coleman Thomas Lechner on behalf of Hoven Vision LLCAttorney Coleman Thomas Lechner added to party Hoven Vision LLC(pty:dft) (Lechner, Coleman)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/27/20 setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/22/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/29/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#4-1] is July 15, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/27/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (alave, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hoven Vision LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7261196)Attorney Richard P. Liebowitz added to party Jana Dillon Jamieson(pty:pla), filed by Jana Dillon Jamieson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamieson v. Hoven Vision LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoven Vision LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jana Dillon Jamieson
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?