Great Northern Insurance Company v. Denver Water
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Defendant: Denver Water
Case Number: 1:2020cv01130
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #12 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/8/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
June 5, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Denver Water All parties consent.. (Popacondria, Tatiana)
June 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gillian Dale on behalf of Denver WaterAttorney Gillian Dale added to party Denver Water(pty:dft) (Dale, Gillian)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/1/2020. At the request of the parties, the Scheduling Conference currently set on June 22, 2020 is vacated and rescheduled to July 29, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. (apesa, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Great Northern Insurance Company. Denver Water waiver sent on 5/8/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Lorden, Emilie)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tatiana G. Popacondria on behalf of Denver WaterAttorney Tatiana G. Popacondria added to party Denver Water(pty:dft) (Popacondria, Tatiana)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew James Hill on behalf of Denver WaterAttorney Andrew James Hill added to party Denver Water(pty:dft) (Hill, Andrew)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/23/2020. Consent Form due by 6/2/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Denver Water re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Great Northern Insurance Company. (O'Brian Williams, Geri)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7262569)Attorney Geri Ann O'Brian Williams added to party Denver Water(pty:dft), filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Brian Williams, Geri) Modified on 4/22/2020 to correct docket entry (trvo, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Northern Insurance Company v. Denver Water
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Water
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Geri Ann O'Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?