Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. v. Straub Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.
Defendant: Straub Construction, Inc. and Western Surety Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01162
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/18/2020. For good cause shown, Plaintiff's Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference [filed June 18,2020; ECF #10 ] is granted as follows. Consent Form due by 7/21/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/21/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2020 01:15 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (apesa, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Decker, Michael)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/18/2020. Before the Court is a Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiff filed by Jean C. Arnold andMichael J. Decker (ECF #7 ). This Court's local rules do not authorize a substitution of counsel; rather, any attorney seeking to withdraw from a case must comply with D.C. Colo. LAttyR 5(b). (apesa, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric Michael Lee on behalf of Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.Attorney Eric Michael Lee added to party Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.(pty:pla) (Lee, Eric)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Plaintiff Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. (Decker, Michael)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER Due to current concerns regarding potential transmission of COVID-19, during the week of June 22, 2020, all hearings and conferences in matters before Magistrate Judge Hegarty will be conducted by telephone unless otherwise requested by counsel or a pro se party. Counsel and any unrepresented non-prisoner parties shall appear at the conference by telephone by calling the following conference line at the appointed time: Number:888-278-0296 Access code:8212991#. Any questions regarding this procedure may be directed to my chambers at 303-844-4507 or at hegarty_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/17/2020. Text Only Entry (mehlc1, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Jason Decker on behalf of Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.Attorney Michael Jason Decker added to party Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.(pty:pla) (Decker, Michael)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/28/2020. Consent Form due by 6/5/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (alave, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin Marietta Materials, Inc., Straub Construction, Inc., Western Surety Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7267100)Attorney Jean Corrine Arnold added to party Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, Western Payment and Performance, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, Miller Act Notice, #3 Ex. C, Open Invoices, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Arnold, Jean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin Marietta Materials, Inc. v. Straub Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Straub Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Marietta Materials, Inc.
Represented By: Jean Corrine Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?