Pike v. Correct Care Solutions et al
Plaintiff: Anthony G. Pike
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions, Art Smith, Lori McLaughlin and Kurt Holmes
Case Number: 1:2020cv01179
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension (ECF No. #8 ) is granted in part, and Plaintiff may file an Amended Prisoner Complaint which complies with the May 26, 2020, Order Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Prisoner Complaint (ECF No. #7 ) on or before July 30, 2020. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Prisoner Complaint within the time allowed, this action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/19/2020.(angar, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension, by Plaintiff Anthony G. Pike. (angar, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Prisoner Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/26/2020. (angar, )
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs Prisoner Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. 3) is denied without prejudice as premature. This case is in preliminary review under D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(a). If the case is drawn to a presiding judge, Plaintiff may renew his motion for appointment of counsel at that time, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/28/2020.(angar, )
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #2 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/28/2020.(angar, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Anthony G. Pike. (trvo, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Anthony G. Pike. (trvo, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Correct Care Solutions, Kurt Holmes, Lori McLaughlin, Art Smith, filed by Anthony G. Pike. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pike v. Correct Care Solutions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony G. Pike
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?