White v. Jefferson County Detention Facility et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Richard White
Defendant: Jefferson County Detention Facility, Jeff Schrader and Rob Reasdon
Case Number: 1:2020cv01180
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re 22 Minute Order,,, to Jonathan Richard White, #P01120975, Jefferson County Detention Facility, P.O. Box 16700, Golden, CO 80402-6700. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER This matter is before the Court on #16 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #1 Prisoner Complaint (the "Motion"). A Telephonic Motion Hearing re: the Motion is set for 7/6/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall participate in the hearing by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. Any further briefing regarding the Motion--e.g., any reply by Defendants in support of the Motion--is SUSPENDED until after the Hearing. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/22/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM regarding #16 MOTION to Dismiss Prisoner Complaint [ECF No.1] filed by Rob Reasdon, Jeff Schrader, Jefferson County Detention Facility. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/19/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/19/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/19/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
June 18, 2020 Filing 18 Answer in Opposition to #16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss Prisoner Complaint (ECF No #1 ), filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Richard White. (rvill, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Prisoner Complaint [ECF No.1] by Defendants Jefferson County Detention Facility, Rob Reasdon, Jeff Schrader. (Bender, Rachel)
May 22, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Prisoner Complaint [ECF No.1] by Defendants Jefferson County Detention Facility, Rob Reasdon, Jeff Schrader. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bender, Rachel)
May 20, 2020 Filing 15 LETTER re: address by Plaintiff Jonathan Richard White. (rvill, )
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte. Plaintiff has filed a letter expressing his desire to file a motion for a temporary restraining order #13 . Although Plaintiff proceeds pro se, it is not the Court's role to act as his advocate or give advice. Nonetheless, the Court notes that there is nothing precluding Plaintiff from filing such a motion. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/15/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
May 13, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER re: Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Jonathan Richard White. (rvill, )
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon consideration that mail addressed to Plaintiff has been returned as undeliverable #11 . Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(c), Plaintiff is required to file a notice of any change of mailing address not later than five days after the change. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that on or before May 27, 2020, Plaintiff shall file a notice with the court advising of his current mailing address. In the interim, the Clerk is directed to (1) send this Order to the P.O. Box on record; and (2) send this Order and resend ECF No. 4 to Plaintiff in c/o Jefferson County Detention Facility, 200 Jefferson County Parkway, Golden, CO 80401 (see ECF No. 2, p. 5).SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/13/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
May 12, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Addressed to Business Office, Attn: Inmate Accounts. (rvill, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rachel Jane Marilyn Bender on behalf of Jefferson County Detention Facility, Rob Reasdon, Jeff SchraderAttorney Rachel Jane Marilyn Bender added to party Jefferson County Detention Facility(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Jane Marilyn Bender added to party Rob Reasdon(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Jane Marilyn Bender added to party Jeff Schrader(pty:dft) (Bender, Rachel)
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jonathan Richard White. Jefferson County Detention Facility waiver sent on 4/30/2020, answer due 6/29/2020; Rob Reasdon waiver sent on 4/30/2020, answer due 6/29/2020; Jeff Schrader waiver sent on 4/30/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (rvill, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by E-Mail to Jefferson County Legal Department by Clerk of Court re #7 Order. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. Defendants shall file a response to the complaint (ECF No. #1 ) within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 05/01/2020. (rvill, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Prisoner Complaint for Service of Process on Jefferson County (alave, )
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/29/2020. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01180-RM. (sphil, )
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/28/2020, re: #2 the Prisoners Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 is GRANTED. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order the Business Office, Attn: Inmate Accounts, at the Jefferson County Detention Facility in Golden, Colorado. (order mailed to Jefferson County Detention as instructed).(sphil, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Jonathan Richard White. (trvo, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Jefferson County Detention Facility, Rob Reasdon, Jeff Schrader, filed by Jonathan Richard White.(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Jefferson County Detention Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Schrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Reasdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Richard White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?