Physical Therapy Specialists, P.C. v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Physical Therapy Specialists, P.C.
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01190
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/18/2020. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint [filed June 18, 2020; ECF #28 ] is granted in part and denied in part. For good cause shown, the Court will grant Defendant an extension of time in which to file an answer or other response to the operative pleading to August 18, 2020.(apesa, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM regarding #28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/18/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
June 18, 2020 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Viapiano, Christopher)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/17/2020. Scheduling Conference rescheduled for 8/25/2020 01:15 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (apesa, )
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER Due to current concerns regarding potential transmission of COVID-19, during the week of June 22, 2020, all hearings and conferences in matters before Magistrate Judge Hegarty will be conducted by telephone unless otherwise requested by counsel or a pro se party. Counsel and any unrepresented non-prisoner parties shall appear at the conference by telephone by calling the following conference line at the appointed time: Number:888-278-0296 Access code:8212991#. Any questions regarding this procedure may be directed to my chambers at 303-844-4507 or at hegarty_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/17/2020. Text Only Entry (mehlc1, )
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/2/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
June 2, 2020 Filing 24 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #23 Order of Recusal, This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01190 PAB. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF RECUSAL Upon review of the file of this case, I conclude that I must recuse myself from further service in this case because of my business relationship with Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. It is, therefore, ORDERED that the judge's file be returned to the clerk and that the case be reassigned by random draw, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/2/2020. (evana, )
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/1/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 1, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Amanda L. Lundergan on behalf of Physical Therapy Specialists, P.C.Attorney Amanda L. Lundergan added to party Physical Therapy Specialists, P.C.(pty:pla) (Lundergan, Amanda)
June 1, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge Christine M. Arguello for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1190-CMA (angar, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 19 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #17 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01190-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (apesa, )
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/29/2020. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the Defendant declining consent under the D.C. Colo.LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF #17 ), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (apesa, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. All parties do not consent.. (Compton, Patrick)
May 28, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick G. Compton on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.Attorney Patrick G. Compton added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (Compton, Patrick)
May 28, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 6/25/2020. (Viapiano, Christopher)
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Co. for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Viapiano, Christopher)
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Michael Viapiano on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.Attorney Christopher Michael Viapiano added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (Viapiano, Christopher)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Leonid Traps on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.Attorney Leonid Traps added to party Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(pty:dft) (Traps, Leonid)
May 8, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ice, Ariane)
May 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Physical Therapy Specialists, P.C.. (Ice, Ariane)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, of Related Case by Plaintiff Physical Therapy Specialists, P.C. (Ice, Ariane)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/29/2020. Consent Form due by 6/5/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2020 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (trvo, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Ariane Michele Ice. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX094926. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Ariane Michele Ice added to party PHYSICAL THERAPY SPECIALISTS, P.C.(pty:pla), filed by PHYSICAL THERAPY SPECIALISTS, P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ice, Ariane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Physical Therapy Specialists, P.C. v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Physical Therapy Specialists, P.C.
Represented By: Ariane Michele Ice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?