Bennington et al v. Stryker Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Corinne Bennington and Stephen Bennington
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales Corporation, Corin USA Limited, CO and Corin Group, PLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01211
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 26 June 2020. Because this case was reassigned to the Honorable Gordon P. Gallagher 23 , the Scheduling Conference set for July 13, 2020 before this Court is vacated. (cmadr, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dayna Lynn Dowdy on behalf of Corin Group, PLC, Corin USA Limited, COAttorney Dayna Lynn Dowdy added to party Corin Group, PLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dayna Lynn Dowdy added to party Corin USA Limited, CO(pty:dft) (Dowdy, Dayna)
June 25, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Meghan W. Martinez on behalf of Corin Group, PLC, Corin USA Limited, COAttorney Meghan W. Martinez added to party Corin Group, PLC(pty:dft), Attorney Meghan W. Martinez added to party Corin USA Limited, CO(pty:dft) (Martinez, Meghan)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: This matter has its factual nexus in Rout County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 20-cv-1211-CMA-GPG. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/25/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/23/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 23, 2020 Filing 21 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #20 Minute Order. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01211-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 23 June 2020. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) #19 , the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (cmadr, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales Corporation All parties do not consent.. (Walton, Kevin)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/8/2020. Granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond re #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint, Howmedica Osteonics Corporation answer due 7/10/2020; Stryker Corporation answer due 7/10/2020; Stryker Sales Corporation answer due 7/10/2020.(apesa, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint, by Defendants Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales Corporation. (Walton, Kevin)
May 27, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corinne Bennington. Corin USA Limited, CO served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (Dieruf, Anne)
May 21, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corinne Bennington. Howmedica Osteonics Corporation served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Dieruf, Anne)
May 21, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corinne Bennington. Stryker Sales Corporation served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Dieruf, Anne)
May 21, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corinne Bennington. Stryker Corporation served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Dieruf, Anne)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Corin Group, PLC, Corin USA Limited, CO, Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales Corporation, filed by Corinne Bennington. (Attachments: #1 Summons Stryker, #2 Summons Stryker Sales, #3 Summons Howmedica, #4 Summons Corin USA)(Dieruf, Anne)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Corinne Bennington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dieruf, Anne)
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason William Jordan on behalf of Corinne Bennington, Stephen BenningtonAttorney Jason William Jordan added to party Corinne Bennington(pty:pla), Attorney Jason William Jordan added to party Stephen Bennington(pty:pla) (Jordan, Jason)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Corin USA Limited CO by Plaintiffs Corinne Bennington, Stephen Bennington. (Dieruf, Anne)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Howmedica Osteonics Corporation by Plaintiffs Corinne Bennington, Stephen Bennington. (Dieruf, Anne)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Stryker Sales Corporation by Plaintiffs Corinne Bennington, Stephen Bennington. (Dieruf, Anne)
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Stryker Corporation by Plaintiffs Corinne Bennington, Stephen Bennington. (Dieruf, Anne)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/1/2020. Consent Form due by 6/23/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. The summons submitted has incorrect caption and not issued. All defendants must be listed. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (trvo, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Corin Group, PLC, Corin USA Limited, CO, Does 1-20, Does Entities 11-20, Howmedica Osteonics Corporation, Stryker Corporation, Stryker Sales Corporation (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7275509)Attorney Anne Marie Dieruf added to party Corinne Bennington(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Marie Dieruf added to party Stephen Bennington(pty:pla), filed by Stephen Bennington, Corinne Bennington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Stryker, #3 Summons Stryker Sales, #4 Summons Howmedica, #5 Summons Corin USA)(Dieruf, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennington et al v. Stryker Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Sales Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corin USA Limited, CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corin Group, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corinne Bennington
Represented By: Anne Marie Dieruf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bennington
Represented By: Anne Marie Dieruf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?