McBurney v. MRS BPO, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Christa McBurney
Defendant: MRS BPO, L.L.C. and Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01287
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER re: #8 Notice of Settlement by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/11/2020. Plaintiff and Defendant Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. shall file an appropriate Dismissal Paper by 7/9/2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Christa McBurney (Vedra, Daniel)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent MRS Associates, Inc. for MRS BPO, L.L.C.. (Poncin, Michael)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MRS BPO, L.L.C..(Poncin, Michael)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Scott Poncin on behalf of MRS BPO, L.L.C.Attorney Michael Scott Poncin added to party MRS BPO, L.L.C.(pty:dft) (Poncin, Michael)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/15/20, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 7/9/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/16/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Convergent Outsourcing, Inc., MRS BPO, L.L.C. d/b/a MRS Associates (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7285643)Attorney Daniel James Vedra added to party Christa McBurney(pty:pla), filed by Christa McBurney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Vedra, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McBurney v. MRS BPO, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRS BPO, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christa McBurney
Represented By: Daniel James Vedra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?