All Plastic, Inc. v. Sam Dan LLC et al
Plaintiff: All Plastics, Inc. and All Plastic, Inc.
Defendant: Samuel Whetsel, Sam Dan LLC, Daniel Russell-Einhorn, Samuel (I) Whetsel, Daniel (I) Russell-Einhorn and Sam Dan LLC a South Carolina limited liability company doing business as Smokus Focus doing business as Smokusfocus.com
Case Number: 1:2020cv01318
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plastic, Inc.. Daniel Russell-Einhorn waiver sent on 5/18/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Wilson, Jason)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plastic, Inc.. Samuel Whetsel waiver sent on 5/18/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Wilson, Jason)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by All Plastic, Inc.. Sam Dan LLC waiver sent on 5/18/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Wilson, Jason)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/15/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline For Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 7/8/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/15/2020. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/22/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Sam Dan LLC d/b/a Smokus Focus and Smokusfocus.com; Samuel Whetsel; Daniel Russell-Einhorn re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff All Plastic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Wilson, Jason)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (trvo, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. The summons submitted has incorrect caption and not issued. All defendants must be listed. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (trvo, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Wilson, Jason)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Russell-Einhorn, Sam Dan LLC, Samuel Whetsel (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7288493)Attorney Jason Haruo Wilson added to party All Plastics, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by All Plastics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Summons (Sam Dan LLC), #4 Summons (Whetsel, #5 Summons (Russell-Einhorn), #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: All Plastic, Inc. v. Sam Dan LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Whetsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Dan LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Russell-Einhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel (I) Whetsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel (I) Russell-Einhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Dan LLC a South Carolina limited liability company doing business as Smokus Focus doing business as Smokusfocus.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plastics, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Haruo Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plastic, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Haruo Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?