Runyon v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Scott M. Runyon
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01352
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to #9 Notice of Settlement, the parties shall file Dismissal Papers or a report regarding the status of settlement on or before 8/20/2020. The Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2020 09:30 AM is VACATED. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/02/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Scott M. Runyon (Badwan, Mohammed)
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Scott M. Runyon. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC waiver sent on 5/13/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Davidson, Joseph)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/18/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 8/4/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/11/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/18/2020. (jgonz, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Victor Thomas Metroff on behalf of Scott M. RunyonAttorney Victor Thomas Metroff added to party Scott M. Runyon(pty:pla) (Metroff, Victor)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mohammed Omar Badwan on behalf of Scott M. RunyonAttorney Mohammed Omar Badwan added to party Scott M. Runyon(pty:pla) (Badwan, Mohammed)
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Scott Davidson on behalf of Scott M. Runyon (Davidson, Joseph)
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7292950)Attorney Joseph Scott Davidson added to party Scott M. Runyon(pty:pla), filed by Scott M. Runyon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Davidson, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Runyon v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott M. Runyon
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan
Represented By: Victor Thomas Metroff
Represented By: Joseph Scott Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?