United Specialty Insurance Company v. First Mercury Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: United Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Amtrust North America, Inc., First Mercury Insurance Company, Clarendon National Insurance Company, Addison Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company and Berkley Regional Specialty Insurance
Case Number: 1:2020cv01359
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Defendant Country Mutual Insurance Company's Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint until 8/3/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/09/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Feldkamp, Chanda)
July 9, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Amtrust North America, Inc. by Plaintiff United Specialty Insurance Company (Kalvestran, Jennifer)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Amtrust North America, Inc.'s Motion for Second Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint until 7/9/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/29/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
June 29, 2020 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #25 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint by Defendant Amtrust North America, Inc.. (Schneider, Laura)
June 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER Because not all Defendants have yet appeared in this matter, the Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2020 09:15 AM is VACATED and RESET For 8/25/2020 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form on or before 8/11/2020, and shall submit a joint proposed scheduling order on or before 8/18/2020. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/28/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Defendant Country Mutual Insurance Company's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint until 7/13/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/26/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #12 Amended Complaint, by Defendant Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Feldkamp, Chanda)
June 19, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party Addison Insurance Company by Plaintiff United Specialty Insurance Company (Kalvestran, Jennifer)
June 19, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer C. Kalvestran on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jennifer C. Kalvestran added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Kalvestran, Jennifer)
June 17, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Amtrust North America, Inc.. Amtrust North America, Inc. answer due 6/29/2020. (Schneider, Laura)
June 17, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Laura Willim Trask Schneider on behalf of Amtrust North America, Inc.Attorney Laura Willim Trask Schneider added to party Amtrust North America, Inc.(pty:dft) (Schneider, Laura)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Casey A. Quillen terminated as counsel of record and the Clerk of Court is instructed to remove her name from the electronic certificate of mailing. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/17/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc2, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Casey A. Quillen by Defendant Country Mutual Insurance Company. (Quillen, Casey)
June 15, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE re #12 Amended Complaint, Service of Amended Complaint on Country Mutual Insurance Company by Plaintiff United Specialty Insurance Company (Graif, Jay)
June 5, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION re #12 Amended Complaint, for Extension of Time to Respond by Defendant Addison Insurance Company. (O'Connor, Sean)
June 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Chanda Marie Feldkamp on behalf of Country Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Chanda Marie Feldkamp added to party Country Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Feldkamp, Chanda)
June 5, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William James Kelly, III on behalf of Country Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney William James Kelly, III added to party Country Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Kelly, William)
June 3, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Country Mutual Insurance Company. Country Mutual Insurance Company answer due 6/15/2020. (Quillen, Casey)
June 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on Behalf of Defendant Addison Insurance Company by Sean Patrick O'Connor on behalf of Addison Insurance CompanyAttorney Sean Patrick O'Connor added to party Addison Insurance Company(pty:dft) (O'Connor, Sean)
June 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on Behalf of Defendant Addison Insurance Company by John Roland Chase on behalf of Addison Insurance CompanyAttorney John Roland Chase added to party Addison Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Chase, John)
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Casey A. Quillen on behalf of Country Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Casey A. Quillen added to party Country Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Quillen, Casey)
May 28, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT United Specialty First Amended Complaint against Addison Insurance Company, Amtrust North America, Inc., Berkley Regional Specialty Insurance, Country Mutual Insurance Company, First Mercury Insurance Company, filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended Summons)(Graif, Jay)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Specialty Insurance Company. First Mercury Insurance Company served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Graif, Jay)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Specialty Insurance Company. Addison Insurance Company served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Graif, Jay)
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Specialty Insurance Company. Amtrust North America, Inc. served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Graif, Jay)
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Specialty Insurance Company. Country Mutual Insurance Company served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Graif, Jay)
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United Specialty Insurance Company. Berkley Regional Specialty Insurance served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Graif, Jay)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/16/2020 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 7/2/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/9/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/14/2020. (jgonz, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Jay Richard Graif. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent State National Insurance Company for United Specialty Insurance Company. (Graif, Jay)
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Addison Insurance Company, Amtrust North America, Inc., Berkley Regional Specialty Insurance, Clarendon National Insurance Company, Country Mutual Insurance Company, First Mercury Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7293688)Attorney Jay Richard Graif added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla), filed by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Graif, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Specialty Insurance Company v. First Mercury Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jay Richard Graif
Represented By: Jennifer C. Kalvestran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrust North America, Inc.
Represented By: Laura Willim Trask Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Mercury Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarendon National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Addison Insurance Company
Represented By: John Roland Chase
Represented By: Sean Patrick O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Chanda Marie Feldkamp
Represented By: William James Kelly, III
Represented By: Casey A. Quillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkley Regional Specialty Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?