O'Neil v. Weld County
Case Number: 1:2020cv01362
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241st - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 JUDGMENT re: #9 Order Dismissing Case, by Clerk on 6/17/2020. (evana, )
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to cure the deficiencies and for failure to prosecute. That leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order is not taken in good faith, and, therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/17/2020. (evana, )
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty days from the date of this Order. Any papers that Petitioner files in response to this Order must include the civil action number on this Order. That if Petitioner fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order the action will be dismissed without further notice. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/14/2020. (evana, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:20-cv-00655. File, transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Transferring Case to the District of Colorado and Denying #4 Motion for Subpoena Without Prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/13/2020.]
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 5, receipt number NVLAS069922. (ADR) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/13/2020.]
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Subpoena by Petitioner Aimee O'Neil. Responses due by 5/19/2020. (MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/13/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Weld County has been received and assigned case number 2:20-cv-00655-JAD-EJY. (MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/13/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Cover Letter) (MR) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/13/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JM) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/13/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neil v. Weld County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?