Nelson v. Elias
Petitioner: Brett Andrew Nelson
Respondent: Rosana Fonseca Elias
Case Number: 1:2020cv01377
Filed: May 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241st
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGMENT, by Clerk re: #6 Order of Dismissal on 6/24/2020. (apesa, ) Modified on 7/1/2020 to add linkage (apesa, ).
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ORDERED that the Petition for an Absolute Original Prerogative Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Subjiciendum (ECF No. #1 ) is denied and the action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure because Petitioner failed to cure the deficiency as directed. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal isdenied without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #2 ) is denied as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/24/2020. (apesa, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Order to Cure Deficiencies, by Petitioner Brett Andrew Nelson. (apesa, )
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. ORDERED that Petitioner cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall obtain the court-approved form, along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. FURTHER ORDERED that, if Petitioner fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/19/2020. (apesa, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Petitioner Brett Andrew Nelson. (cmadr, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for an Absolute Original Prerogative Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Brett Andrew Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rosana Fonseca Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brett Andrew Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?