Dyer v. Berkenkotter et al
Defendant: J.P. Martin and Maria E. Berkenkotter
Petitioner: Brendan Patrick Dyer and Brendan Dyer
Respondent: Dean Williams and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2020cv01378
Filed: May 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Dismissing Case. The voluntary dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE and is effective as of June 8, 2020, the date Mr. Dyer filed a Letter (ECF No. #12 ) in which he requests voluntary dismissal of this action. All pending motions are DENIED as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/10/2020. (angar, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Petitioner Brendan Patrick Dyer. (evana, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 11 Additional Facts, by Petitioner Brendan Patrick Dyer. (angar, )
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254, filed by Brendan Patrick Dyer. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(angar, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against Maria E. Berkenkotter, J.P. Martin,., filed by Brendan Patrick Dyer. ***Defendants J.P. Martin and Maria E. Berkenkotter, added. Respondents Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The and Dean Williams are terminated (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sphil, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Petitioner Brendan Patrick Dyer. (sphil, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER re: #3 Order, by Petitioner Brendan Patrick Dyer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sphil, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Show Cause. If Applicant fails to show cause within the time allowed, the Application will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal will be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/26/2020. (angar, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Motion Leave to Proceed Pursuant to U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/26/2020.(angar, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, by Petitioner Brendan Patrick Dyer. (angar, )
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Mr. Dyer fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/18/2020. (angar, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2254, filed by Brendan Patrick Dyer. (Attachments: #1 Letter to the Clerk of Court)(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dyer v. Berkenkotter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brendan Patrick Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brendan Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dean Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria E. Berkenkotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?