Harris et al v. Romero et al
Plaintiff: Marquise D. Harris and Dedrick D. Harris
Defendant: John Davidson, Robert J. Foster, Emily Casper, Martinez, Pazen, Dik Kushdillian, City & County of Denver, Jessy Avedanon, James Dixion, Reiner, Mark Romero, Beth McCann, Jenkins, Ginen Hatter-Perez, Novonty, Dik Kushdilian and Emily Capser
Case Number: 1:2020cv01396
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
2 Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 21 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Jessy Avedanon, Emily Capser, City & County of Denver, John Davidson, James Dixion, Robert J. Foster, Ginen Hatter-Perez, Jenkins, Dik Kushdilian, Beth McCann, Novonty, Pazen, Reiner, Mark Romero All parties do not consent.. (Huss, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER The upcoming hearing in this matter shall be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The Court thanks the parties in advance for their patience and flexibility as the Court implements this new technology. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 7/13/2020. Text Only Entry. (slibi, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Charles Huss on behalf of Jessy Avedanon, Emily Capser, City & County of Denver, John Davidson, James Dixion, Robert J. Foster, Ginen Hatter-Perez, Jenkins, Dik Kushdilian, Novonty, Pazen, ReinerAttorney Robert Charles Huss added to party Jessy Avedanon(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Huss added to party Emily Capser(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Huss added to party City & County of Denver(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Huss added to party John Davidson(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Huss added to party James Dixion(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Huss added to party Robert J. Foster(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Huss added to party Ginen Hatter-Perez(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Huss added to party Jenkins(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Huss added to party Dik Kushdilian(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Huss added to party Novonty(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Huss added to party Pazen(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Charles Huss added to party Reiner(pty:dft) (Huss, Robert)
June 29, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dedrick D. Harris, Marquise D. Harris. Jessy Avedanon waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020; Emily Capser waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020; City & County of Denver waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020; James Dixion waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020; Robert J. Foster waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020; Ginen Hatter-Perez waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020; Jenkins waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020; Dik Kushdilian waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020; Novonty waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020; Pazen waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020; Reiner waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020; Mark Romero waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (rvill, )
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/17/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/17/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
June 16, 2020 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 and #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff does not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01396-RM. (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Marquise D. Harris Plaintiff does not consent. (rvill, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Dedrick D. Harris Plaintiff does not consent. (rvill, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #11 Order Setting Status Conference for Pre Se Plaintiff to Marquise D. Harris, 1163 Dallas Street, Aurora, CO 80010 and Dedrick D. Harris, 1163 Dallas Street, Aurora, CO 80010. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Status Conference for Pre Se Plaintiff. Consent Form due by 7/13/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 06/05/2020. (rvill, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Complaint for Service of Process. (cmadr, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (apesa, )
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DRAWING CASE. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter all future pleading should be designated as 20-cv-01396-NRN, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/3/2020. (apesa, )
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis re: #7 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/27/2020.(apesa, )
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. ORDERED that the Applications to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF Nos. #3 and #6 ) are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Paying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that process shall not issue at this time. FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service shall serve process on any remaining defendant(s) for whom personal service is required if the case is later drawn to a district judge and/or a magistrate judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(c), by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/27/2020. (apesa, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS, by Plaintiff Marquise D. Harris. (apesa, )
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY. ORDERED that Plaintiff Marquise Harris cure the deficiency designated above within thirty days from the date of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall obtain the Court-approved form for filing an Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. ORDERED that if Plaintiff Marquise Harris fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty days from the date of this Order, he may be dismissed from the action without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/19/2020. (apesa, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Dedrick D. Harris. (cmadr, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Marquise D. Harris. (cmadr, )
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jessy Avedanon, Emily Casper, City & County of Denver, John Davidson, James Dixion, Robert J. Foster, Ginen Hatter-Perez, Jenkins, Dik Kushdillian, Martinez, Beth McCann, Novonty, Pazen, Reiner, Mark Romero, filed by Dedrick D. Harris, Marquise D. Harris.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris et al v. Romero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Davidson
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Foster
Represented By: Wendy J. Shea
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pazen
Represented By: Wendy J. Shea
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dik Kushdillian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City & County of Denver
Represented By: Wendy J. Shea
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessy Avedanon
Represented By: Wendy J. Shea
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dixion
Represented By: Wendy J. Shea
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reiner
Represented By: Wendy J. Shea
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Romero
Represented By: Wendy J. Shea
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth McCann
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenkins
Represented By: Wendy J. Shea
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginen Hatter-Perez
Represented By: Wendy J. Shea
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novonty
Represented By: Wendy J. Shea
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dik Kushdilian
Represented By: Wendy J. Shea
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Capser
Represented By: Wendy J. Shea
Represented By: Robert Charles Huss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquise D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dedrick D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?