Ortiz v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Monica Ortiz
Defendant: Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC and Cook Group Incorporated
Case Number: 1:2020cv01448
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to the Southern District of Indiana pursuant to the Certified copy of the Conditional Transfer Order. InterdistrictTransfer_INSD@insd.uscourts.gov. Text Only Entry (evana, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-88) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 20-cv-01448 KLM, to the Southern District of Indiana, to become part of MDL 2570 by Clerk on 6/5/2020. (evana, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/26/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/2/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/9/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 attachment 1, #2 attachment 2) (nmarb, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#3-3] is August 26, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/26/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7305227)Attorney Justin Tyler Bailey added to party Monica Ortiz(pty:pla), filed by Monica Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Cook Group Incorporated, #3 Summons Cook Incorporated, #4 Summons Cook Medical)(Bailey, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Ortiz
Represented By: Justin Tyler Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?