Ferguson v. Purcell
Case Number: 1:2020cv01457
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 14 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:20-cv-00663. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
May 21, 2020 Filing 12 TRANSMITTAL of case to the District of Colorado. Case and docket sheet transferred electronically. (no image attached) (ADR) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/22/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #9 the motion to transfer venue is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that #5 the motion to quash is denied as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court to transfer this case to the District of Colorado and close the file in this court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/22/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of No Opposition to #9 Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1406(a, by Juana Purcell. (Ranalli, George) Modified on 5/21/2020 to link document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (SLD). [Transferred from Nevada on 5/22/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Pursuant to 28 USC 1406(a) . Responses due by 6/2/2020. (McGaha, William) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/22/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Quash by Plaintiff Hailey Ferguson. Replies due by 5/26/2020. (McGaha, William) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/22/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #5 Motion to Quash. Responses due by 5/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/22/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 First STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Opposition re #5 Motion to Quash by Plaintiff Hailey Ferguson. (McGaha, William) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/22/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Defendant Juana Purcell. (Ranalli, George) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/22/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hailey Ferguson re #1 Complaint. Juana Purcell served on 4/13/2020. (McGaha, William) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/22/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/22/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Juana Purcell re #1 Complaint. (SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/22/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Juana Purcell (Filing fee $400) by Hailey Ferguson. Proof of service due by 7/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/22/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (SLD) [Transferred from Nevada on 5/22/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?