State of Colorado, The v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: State of Colorado, The
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler, R.D. James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers and U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Intervenor Defendant: Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry & Egg Association, Leading Builders of America, American Petroleum Institute, Michael Sackett, National Pork Producers Council, National Mining Association, National Alliance of Forest Owners, National Association of Home Builders, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, American Farm Bureau Federation, Chantell Sackett, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association and National Corn Growers Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv01461
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
2 Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: APA Review/Appeal
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 81 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by State of Colorado, The.(Hunt, Jennifer)
July 20, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading (Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief) by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hunt, Jennifer)
July 17, 2020 Filing 79 LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to #70 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Sackett, Chantell Sackett. A transcript order form was filed stating that a transcript is not necessary. ( Appeal No. 20-1262) Text Only Entry (angar, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 78 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Leading Builders of America, National Alliance of Forest Owners, National Association of Home Builders, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry & Egg Association.(Bishop, Timothy)
July 17, 2020 Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #70 Notice of Appeal (Transcript not necessary) by Intervenor Defendants Chantell Sackett, Michael Sackett (Roper, Glenn)
July 16, 2020 Filing 76 USCA Case Number 20-1263 for #71 Notice of Appeal,, filed by National Association of Home Builders, National Pork Producers Council, National Mining Association, U.S. Poultry & Egg Association, American Farm Bureau Federation, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Alliance of Forest Owners, Public Lands Council, National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association, National Corn Growers Association, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Leading Builders of America, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. (angar, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 75 USCA Case Number 20-1262 for #70 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Sackett, Chantell Sackett. (angar, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 74 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #71 Notice of Appeal,, filed by National Association of Home Builders, National Pork Producers Council, National Mining Association, U.S. Poultry & Egg Association, American Farm Bureau Federation, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Alliance of Forest Owners, Public Lands Council, National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association, National Corn Growers Association, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Leading Builders of America, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record and Docket Sheet)(angar, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 73 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #70 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael Sackett, Chantell Sackett to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record and Docket Sheet)(angar, ) Modified on 7/16/2020 to correct letter (angar, ). Modified on 7/16/2020 to attach the correct transmittal letter (athom, ).
July 15, 2020 Filing 72 BRIEF in Opposition to #24 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Intervenor Defendants American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Leading Builders of America, National Alliance of Forest Owners, National Association of Home Builders, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry & Egg Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Don Parrish, #2 Exhibit A to Parrish Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Parrish Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Parrish Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Parrish Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Parrish Declaration)(Bishop, Timothy)
July 15, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #61 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Intervenor Defendants American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Leading Builders of America, National Alliance of Forest Owners, National Association of Home Builders, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry & Egg Association (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number 1082-7387981) (Bishop, Timothy)
July 15, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #61 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Intervenor Defendants Chantell Sackett, Michael Sackett (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number 1082-7387742) (Roper, Glenn)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting Motions to Intervene. The Sacketts' Unopposed Motion to Intervene (ECF No. #42 ) is GRANTED. The Unopposed Motion to Intervene of Proposed Business Intervenors (ECF No. #49 ) is GRANTED. The Sacketts' Unopposed Motion for Expedited Ruling on Unopposed Motion to Intervene (ECF No. #68 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/15/2020.(angar, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION to Expedite Ruling by Intervenor Defendants Chantell Sackett, Michael Sackett. (Roper, Glenn)
June 29, 2020 Filing 67 LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to #62 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, R.D. James, Andrew Wheeler, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. A transcript order form was filed stating that a transcript is not necessary. ( Appeal No. 20-1238) Text Only Entry (angar, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 66 USCA Case Number 20-1238 for #62 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, R.D. James, Andrew Wheeler, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (angar, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re #62 Notice of Appeal by Defendants R.D. James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler (Shea, Sonya)
June 24, 2020 Filing 64 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #62 Notice of Appeal filed by U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, R.D. James, Andrew Wheeler, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( USA,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record and Docket Sheet)(angar, )
June 23, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION (Supplemental) by Sonya Joy Shea on behalf of All Defendants (Shea, Sonya)
June 23, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #61 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants R.D. James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler (Dupre, Phillip)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction #24 , construed as a motion for a stay of agency action under APA 705, by Judge William J. Martinez on 06/19/2020. (wjmlc1)
June 19, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities re: #24 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants R.D. James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler (Attachments: #1 California v. Wheeler, No. 3:20-cv-3005 (N.D. Cal.) Order Denying Motion for Preliminary Relief)(Shea, Sonya)
June 18, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities re: #24 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Supreme Court Opinion)(Hunt, Jennifer)
June 18, 2020 Filing 58 BRIEF in Support of #24 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Supplemental) filed by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Noteboom, Carrie)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction #24 . Plaintiff's position is that the Colorado Water Quality Control Act forbids all (or almost all) dredge and fill "[b]ecause discharges of large quantities of fill, by their nature, are likely to result in exceedances of state water quality standards." (Id. at 8.) If that is correct, it appears that a party with a section 404 fill permit from the Corps of Engineers violates Colorado's stricter standards when carrying out those fill activities. Cf. 33 U.S.C. 1344(t) (allowing states to have stricter standards than required for a section 404 permit). With this in mind, Plaintiff shall file a supplemental brief of no more than 5 pages (calculated according to WJM Revised Practice Standard III.C.1) no later than this Thursday, June 18, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., addressing the following: Is the Court correct that parties with a section 404 fill permit violate the Colorado Water Quality Control Act when they discharge fill into "state waters"? If not, why not? If so, under what authority has Plaintiff elected to-date to forego state-law enforcement actions against such parties? And what authority compels Plaintiff to begin bringing state-law enforcement actions in such circumstances if the 2020 Rule goes into effect? SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 06/16/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1)
June 11, 2020 Filing 56 DECLARATION of Nicole Rowan regarding Reply to Response to Motion #55 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Noteboom, Carrie)
June 11, 2020 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to #24 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Noteboom, Carrie)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 AMENDED 53 ORDER striking Notice of Appearance by Timothy Bishop #45 , Notice of Appearance by Colleen Campbell #46 , Notice of Appearance by Brett Legner #47 , and Notice of Appearance of Glenn E. Roper #52 . The aforementioned Notices of Appearance are STRICKEN given that they were entered without the entry of a prior order granting intervention, and are thus contrary to the practice of this District Court. Through their motions to intervene, counsel have already appeared for purposes of seeking intervention. While those motions are pending, counsel will continue to receive CM/ECF notices. If a motion to intervene is granted, counsel who filed the motion will be deemed to have already appeared by virtue of the motion, and in such instance no further notice of appearance will be necessary. If one or more of the intervention motions are denied, CM/ECF notices in this action to the respective attorney(s) will cease. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/11/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER striking Notice of Appearance by Timothy Bishop #45 , Notice of Appearance by Colleen Campbell #46 , Notice of Appearance by Brett Legner #47 , Notice of Appearance by Devon McCune #50 , and Notice of Appearance of Glenn E. Roper #52 . The aforementioned Notices of Appearance are STRICKEN given that they were entered without the entry of a prior order granting intervention, and are thus contrary to the practice of this District Court. Through their motions to intervene, counsel have already appeared for purposes of seeking intervention. While those motions are pending, counsel will continue to receive CM/ECF notices. If a motion to intervene is granted, counsel who filed the motion will be deemed to have already appeared by virtue of the motion, and in such instance no further notice of appearance will be necessary. If one or more of the intervention motions are denied, CM/ECF notices in this action to the respective attorney(s) will cease. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/10/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 52 STRICKEN NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Glenn E. Roper on behalf of Chantell Sackett, Michael SackettAttorney Glenn E. Roper added to party Chantell Sackett(pty:intvd), Attorney Glenn E. Roper added to party Michael Sackett(pty:intvd) (Roper, Glenn) Modified on 6/11/2020 to strike pursuant to 54 Order (angar, ).
June 8, 2020 Filing 51 BRIEF in Opposition to #24 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants R.D. James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler. (Shea, Sonya)
June 8, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Devon Lehman McCune on behalf of R.D. James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew WheelerAttorney Devon Lehman McCune added to party R.D. James(pty:dft), Attorney Devon Lehman McCune added to party U.S. Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft), Attorney Devon Lehman McCune added to party U.S. Environmental Protection Agency(pty:dft), Attorney Devon Lehman McCune added to party Andrew Wheeler(pty:dft) (McCune, Devon)
June 8, 2020 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Defendants American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Leading Builders of America, National Alliance of Forest Owners, National Association of Home Builders, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry & Egg Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Proposed Answer, #2 Proposed Document Proposed Opposition, #3 Declaration of Don Parrish, #4 Exhibit A to Parrish Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Parrish Declaration, #6 Exhibit C to Parrish Declaration, #7 Exhibit D to Parrish Declaration, #8 Exhibit E to Parrish Declaration)(Bishop, Timothy)
June 8, 2020 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Bishop, Timothy)
June 8, 2020 Filing 47 STRICKEN NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brett Emerson Legner on behalf of American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Leading Builders of America, National Alliance of Forest Owners, National Association of Home Builders, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry & Egg AssociationAttorney Brett Emerson Legner added to party American Farm Bureau Federation(pty:intvd), Attorney Brett Emerson Legner added to party American Petroleum Institute(pty:intvd), Attorney Brett Emerson Legner added to party American Road and Transportation Builders Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Brett Emerson Legner added to party Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America(pty:intvd), Attorney Brett Emerson Legner added to party Leading Builders of America(pty:intvd), Attorney Brett Emerson Legner added to party National Alliance of Forest Owners(pty:intvd), Attorney Brett Emerson Legner added to party National Association of Home Builders(pty:intvd), Attorney Brett Emerson Legner added to party National Cattlemen's Beef Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Brett Emerson Legner added to party National Corn Growers Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Brett Emerson Legner added to party National Mining Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Brett Emerson Legner added to party National Pork Producers Council(pty:intvd), Attorney Brett Emerson Legner added to party National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Brett Emerson Legner added to party Public Lands Council(pty:intvd), Attorney Brett Emerson Legner added to party U.S. Poultry & Egg Association(pty:intvd) (Legner, Brett) Modified on 6/11/2020 to strike pursuant to 54 Order (angar, ).
June 8, 2020 Filing 46 STRICKEN NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Colleen M. Campbell on behalf of American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Leading Builders of America, National Alliance of Forest Owners, National Association of Home Builders, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry & Egg AssociationAttorney Colleen M. Campbell added to party American Farm Bureau Federation(pty:intvd), Attorney Colleen M. Campbell added to party American Petroleum Institute(pty:intvd), Attorney Colleen M. Campbell added to party American Road and Transportation Builders Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Colleen M. Campbell added to party Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America(pty:intvd), Attorney Colleen M. Campbell added to party Leading Builders of America(pty:intvd), Attorney Colleen M. Campbell added to party National Alliance of Forest Owners(pty:intvd), Attorney Colleen M. Campbell added to party National Association of Home Builders(pty:intvd), Attorney Colleen M. Campbell added to party National Cattlemen's Beef Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Colleen M. Campbell added to party National Corn Growers Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Colleen M. Campbell added to party National Mining Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Colleen M. Campbell added to party National Pork Producers Council(pty:intvd), Attorney Colleen M. Campbell added to party National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Colleen M. Campbell added to party Public Lands Council(pty:intvd), Attorney Colleen M. Campbell added to party U.S. Poultry & Egg Association(pty:intvd) (Campbell, Colleen) Modified on 6/11/2020 to strike pursuant to 54 Order (angar, ).
June 8, 2020 Filing 45 STRICKEN NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy S. Bishop on behalf of American Farm Bureau Federation, American Petroleum Institute, American Road and Transportation Builders Association, Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, Leading Builders of America, National Alliance of Forest Owners, National Association of Home Builders, National Cattlemen's Beef Association, National Corn Growers Association, National Mining Association, National Pork Producers Council, National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association, Public Lands Council, U.S. Poultry & Egg AssociationAttorney Timothy S. Bishop added to party American Farm Bureau Federation(pty:intvd), Attorney Timothy S. Bishop added to party American Petroleum Institute(pty:intvd), Attorney Timothy S. Bishop added to party American Road and Transportation Builders Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Timothy S. Bishop added to party Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America(pty:intvd), Attorney Timothy S. Bishop added to party Leading Builders of America(pty:intvd), Attorney Timothy S. Bishop added to party National Alliance of Forest Owners(pty:intvd), Attorney Timothy S. Bishop added to party National Association of Home Builders(pty:intvd), Attorney Timothy S. Bishop added to party National Cattlemen's Beef Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Timothy S. Bishop added to party National Corn Growers Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Timothy S. Bishop added to party National Mining Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Timothy S. Bishop added to party National Pork Producers Council(pty:intvd), Attorney Timothy S. Bishop added to party National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association(pty:intvd), Attorney Timothy S. Bishop added to party Public Lands Council(pty:intvd), Attorney Timothy S. Bishop added to party U.S. Poultry & Egg Association(pty:intvd) (Bishop, Timothy) Modified on 6/11/2020 to strike pursuant to 54 Order (angar, ).
June 4, 2020 Filing 44 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #42 MOTION to Intervene , #43 Declaration filed by attorney Anthony Lee Francois. The s/ signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (rvill, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Chantell Sackett regarding MOTION to Intervene #42 by Intervenor Defendants Chantell Sackett, Michael Sackett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Francois, Anthony)
June 3, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Intervene by Intervenor Defendants Chantell Sackett, Michael Sackett. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Proposed Answer, #2 Proposed Document Proposed Opposition to MPI)(Francois, Anthony)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 6/3/2020. Status Conference set for 8/6/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. (rvill, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Annette M. Quill on behalf of State of Colorado, TheAttorney Annette M. Quill added to party State of Colorado, The(pty:pla) (Quill, Annette)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction #24 . Defendants are DIRECTED to file a Response to the Motion no later than June 8, 2020, not to exceed 22 pages in length, exclusive of attorney signature blocks and certificate of service. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a Reply in support of its Motion no later than June 11, 2020, not to exceed 11 pages in length, exclusive of attorney signature blocks and certificate of service. Upon receipt of Plaintiff's Reply, the Court will determine the necessity of an evidentiary hearing. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not be granting leave for the filing of any amicus brief in support of or in opposition to the currently pending Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/2/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/ 2/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Neureiter, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/2/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Phillip Roark Dupre on behalf of R.D. James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew WheelerAttorney Phillip Roark Dupre added to party R.D. James(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip Roark Dupre added to party U.S. Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip Roark Dupre added to party U.S. Environmental Protection Agency(pty:dft), Attorney Phillip Roark Dupre added to party Andrew Wheeler(pty:dft) (Dupre, Phillip)
June 1, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Notice of Related Cases by Sonya Joy Shea on behalf of All Defendants (Shea, Sonya)
June 1, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sonya Joy Shea on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Sonya Joy Shea added to party R.D. James(pty:dft), Attorney Sonya Joy Shea added to party U.S. Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft), Attorney Sonya Joy Shea added to party U.S. Environmental Protection Agency(pty:dft), Attorney Sonya Joy Shea added to party Andrew Wheeler(pty:dft) (Shea, Sonya)
June 1, 2020 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #26 Declaration, #25 Declaration, #32 Declaration, #27 Declaration, #31 Declaration, #30 Declaration, #29 Declaration, #28 Declaration, #24 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Noteboom, Carrie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Nicole Rowan regarding Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #24 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Noteboom, Carrie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Rebecca Pierce regarding Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #24 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Noteboom, Carrie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Melynda May regarding Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #24 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Noteboom, Carrie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Trevor Klein regarding Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #24 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Noteboom, Carrie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Karen Hamilton regarding Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #24 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Noteboom, Carrie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Michael Gooseff regarding Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #24 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Noteboom, Carrie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Harry Crockett regarding Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #24 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Noteboom, Carrie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Patrick Bachmann regarding Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #24 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noteboom, Carrie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 24 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Noteboom, Carrie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) R.D. James served on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Noteboom, Carrie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Andrew Wheeler served on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Noteboom, Carrie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) U.S. Army Corps of Engineers served on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Noteboom, Carrie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) U.S. Environmental Protection Agency served on 5/22/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. (Noteboom, Carrie)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte. Petitioner is reminded that "[a] party to a case shall file a notice identifying all cases pending in this or any other federal, state, or foreign jurisdiction that are related to the case." D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.1(a). Such a notice is due "at the time of [the party's] first appearance or the filing of its first pleading or document, or other matter addressed to the court." Id. at 3.1(c)(1). Thus, the notice is already overdue. Petitioner is therefore ORDERED to file the required Notice on or before June 3, 2020, or on the same day Petitioner files an Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction, whichever comes first. Without limiting the scope of Petitioner's obligations under this Rule in any manner, such Notice shall include the identification of all cases, whether filed in a federal or state court, brought by the Attorney General or Department of Law of any sister state, raising the same or similar claims against the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency as those asserted in the instant action. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 05/29/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmlc1)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER striking Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction #7 for failure to comply with this Court's Revised Practice Standard III.C.1 which states that the page limits for "ALL OTHER motions... Motion and Response [shall be]: 15 pages; Reply: 10 pages." Given the nature of the claims raised, however, Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file an Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction not to exceed 22 pages, exclusive of attorney signature blocks and certificate of service. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 5/29/2020. Text Only Entry(wjmsec, )
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DIRECTING REASSIGNMENT re Motion for Preliminary Injunction [#7 ]. The clerk of the court shall assign this case to a judge for resolution on the merits under the random assignment procedure of D.C.COLO.LCiv.R 40.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 05/29/2020. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01461-WJM. (athom, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #14 Declaration, #8 Declaration, #15 Declaration, #11 Declaration, #13 Declaration, #6 Notice of Entry of Appearance, #9 Declaration, #12 Declaration, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #10 Declaration by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Noteboom, Carrie)
May 28, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Nicole Rowan regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #7 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Noteboom, Carrie)
May 28, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Rebecca Pierce regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #7 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Noteboom, Carrie)
May 28, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Melynda May regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #7 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Noteboom, Carrie)
May 28, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Trevor Klein regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #7 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Noteboom, Carrie)
May 28, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Karen Hamilton regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #7 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Noteboom, Carrie)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Michael Gooseff regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #7 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Noteboom, Carrie)
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Harry Crockett regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #7 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Noteboom, Carrie)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Patrick Bachmann regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #7 by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Noteboom, Carrie)
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 STRICKEN - MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff State of Colorado, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Noteboom, Carrie) Modified on 6/1/2020 to strike pursuant to 18 Order (athom, ).
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carrie Elizabeth Noteboom on behalf of State of Colorado, TheAttorney Carrie Elizabeth Noteboom added to party State of Colorado, The(pty:pla) (Noteboom, Carrie)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric R. Olson on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Eric R. Olson added to party State of Colorado, The(pty:pla) (Olson, Eric)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PREPARATION OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/26/2020. (sphil, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7307196)Attorney Jennifer H. Hunt added to party State of Colorado, The(pty:pla), filed by State of Colorado, The. (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, #2 Summons Andrew Wheeler, #3 Summons U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, #4 Summons R.D. James, #5 Notice of Related Cases, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hunt, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Colorado, The v. U.S. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado, The
Represented By: Jennifer H. Hunt
Represented By: Annette M. Quill
Represented By: Eric R. Olson
Represented By: Carrie Elizabeth Noteboom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Represented By: Devon Lehman McCune
Represented By: Sonya Joy Shea
Represented By: Phillip Roark Dupre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.D. James
Represented By: Devon Lehman McCune
Represented By: Sonya Joy Shea
Represented By: Phillip Roark Dupre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Devon Lehman McCune
Represented By: Sonya Joy Shea
Represented By: Phillip Roark Dupre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Devon Lehman McCune
Represented By: Sonya Joy Shea
Represented By: Phillip Roark Dupre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Public Lands Council
Represented By: Brett Emerson Legner
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: U.S. Poultry & Egg Association
Represented By: Brett Emerson Legner
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Leading Builders of America
Represented By: Brett Emerson Legner
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: American Petroleum Institute
Represented By: Brett Emerson Legner
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Michael Sackett
Represented By: Anthony Lee Francois
Represented By: Glenn E. Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Pork Producers Council
Represented By: Brett Emerson Legner
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Mining Association
Represented By: Brett Emerson Legner
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Alliance of Forest Owners
Represented By: Brett Emerson Legner
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Association of Home Builders
Represented By: Brett Emerson Legner
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: American Road and Transportation Builders Association
Represented By: Brett Emerson Legner
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Cattlemen's Beef Association
Represented By: Brett Emerson Legner
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: American Farm Bureau Federation
Represented By: Brett Emerson Legner
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Chantell Sackett
Represented By: Anthony Lee Francois
Represented By: Glenn E. Roper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By: Brett Emerson Legner
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Stone, Sand, and Gravel Association
Represented By: Brett Emerson Legner
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: National Corn Growers Association
Represented By: Brett Emerson Legner
Represented By: Colleen M. Campbell
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?