Smart Lock, LLC v. LockState, Inc.
Plaintiff: Smart Lock, LLC
Defendant: LockState, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01479
Filed: May 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant LockState, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 8/17/2020. Furthermore, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 10/15/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, with the Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/8/2020. The Parties shall use the dial-in information as previously ordered. The Consent Form REMAINS DUE 7/29/2020. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/17/2020. Text Only Entry(nywlc2, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, and Continue the Scheduling Conference by Defendant LockState, Inc.. (Juarez, Carolyn)
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smart Lock, LLC. LockState, Inc. served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Ni, Hao)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/1/2020. A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/12/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. The Proposed Scheduling Order is due 8/5/2020. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 7/29/2020. (bwilk, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
May 25, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
May 25, 2020 Filing 5 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (alave, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/16/2020) to convert to non-fillable PDF (alave, ).
May 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to LockState, Inc. by Plaintiff Smart Lock, LLC. (Ni, Hao)
May 25, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ni, Hao)
May 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE AO120 by Plaintiff Smart Lock, LLC (Ni, Hao)
May 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LockState, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7308635)Attorney Hao Ni added to party Smart Lock, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Smart Lock, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ni, Hao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smart Lock, LLC v. LockState, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LockState, Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn Valerie Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smart Lock, LLC
Represented By: Hao Ni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?