Pace v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Christopher Pace
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company and Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 1:2020cv01507
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/15/2020. (bwilk, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 7/15/2020 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discovery due by 6/25/2021. Rule 702 motions due 6/25/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2021. No further extensions will be permitted absent extraordinary circumstances given the length of the original schedule. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/21/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. FTR: NYW-CRD. (bwilk, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. (Joyce, Kyle)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/17/2020. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 7/15/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, with the Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/8/2020. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #14 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/15/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
June 15, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The All parties consent.. (Jones, Max)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/11/2020. Upon review of the #12 Response filed by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The, the court is satisfied that complete diversity exists. Therefore, the #10 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. The Consent Form remains due 6/15/2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #10 Order to Show Cause, by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Joyce, Kyle)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The.(Joyce, Kyle)
June 1, 2020 ***Set/Reset Deadlines: Consent Form due by 6/15/2020, pursuant to #10 Order to Show Cause. (nmarb, )
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/1/20, returnable by Defendant The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 6/15/2020. The Parties shall complete and file a signed Consent/Non-Consent Form on or before June 15, 2020. (nmarb, ) Modified on 6/12/2020 to show as DISCHARGED pursuant to 13 Minute Order. (nmarb, ).
May 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cornell Johnson on behalf of Christopher PaceAttorney Cornell Johnson added to party Christopher Pace(pty:pla) (Johnson, Cornell)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Max K. Jones, Jr on behalf of Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, TheAttorney Max K. Jones, Jr added to party Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The(pty:dft) (Jones, Max)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The, filed by Christopher Pace.(cmadr, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint & Summons upon Travelers Home Marine Insurance Company on 6 May 2020 (cmadr, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The, filed by Christopher Pace.(cmadr, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 20-cv-31041. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7312323), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Document Corporate Disclosure Statement - Defendant, #9 Proposed Document Notice of Filing State Court Docket, #10 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Filing State Court Docket)(Joyce, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pace v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Kyle Brandon Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Kyle Brandon Joyce
Represented By: Max K. Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Pace
Represented By: Cornell Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?