Erickson v. Executive Director of CDOC et al
Petitioner: Oralee Erickson
Respondent: Executive Director of CDOC and LaVista (LVCF) Correctional Facility Warden
Case Number: 1:2020cv01577
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 Preliminary RESPONSE to #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Attorney Nicole S. Gellar added to party Executive Director of CDOC(pty:res), Attorney Nicole S. Gellar added to party LaVista (LVCF) Correctional Facility Warden(pty:res)Attorney Nicole S. Gellar added to party Executive Director of CDOC(pty:res), Attorney Nicole S. Gellar added to party LaVista (LVCF) Correctional Facility Warden(pty:res) by Executive Director of CDOC, LaVista (LVCF) Correctional Facility Warden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Colorado Court E-Filing Records)(Gellar, Nicole)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 Acceptance of Service of Order to File Preliminary Response and an Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus on 7/2/2020, filed by Respondents Executive Director of CDOC, LaVista (LVCF) Correctional Facility Warden (apesa, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus and #5 Order to File Preliminary Response for Service of Process. (trvo, )
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO FILE PRELIMINARY RESPONSE. ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this order Respondents shall file a preliminary response that complies with this order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of the filing of the preliminary response Petitioner may file a reply, if she desires. If Respondents do not intend to raise the affirmative defenses of timeliness or exhaustion of state-court remedies, Respondents must notify the Court of that decision in the preliminary response, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/1/2020. (apesa, )
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/3/2020.(apesa, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App P. 24 in a Habeas Corpus Action. by Petitioner Oralee Erickson. (cmadr, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Oralee Erickson.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erickson v. Executive Director of CDOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Executive Director of CDOC
Represented By: Nicole S. Gellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LaVista (LVCF) Correctional Facility Warden
Represented By: Nicole S. Gellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Oralee Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?