Tracy v. Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc.
Plaintiff: Gerry Tracy
Defendant: Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01597
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen E. Baumann, II on behalf of Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc.Attorney Stephen E. Baumann, II added to party Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc.(pty:dft) (Baumann, Stephen)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Darren E. Nadel on behalf of Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc.Attorney Darren E. Nadel added to party Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc.(pty:dft) (Nadel, Darren)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gerry Tracy. Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc. waiver sent on 6/23/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Whitcomb, Joseph)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/12/20, Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 8/4/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/11/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6 /4/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiffs counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/4/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee: $400, receipt number: COX095286 (trvo, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gerry Tracy (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Timothy James Turner added to party Gerry Tracy(pty:pla), filed by Gerry Tracy. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Turner, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tracy v. Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suncor Energy (U.S.A.) Inc.
Represented By: Darren E. Nadel
Represented By: Stephen E. Baumann, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Tracy
Represented By: Timothy James Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?